Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2352117

EP2352117 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2011/31]
Inventor(s)01 / MIYASHITA, Akira
c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 0075 / JP
02 / SUZUKI, Kazuhiro
c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 0075 / JP
03 / ISHIGE, Hiroyuki
c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 0075 / JP
 [2011/31]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard Partnerschaft
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
Former [2011/31]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date10818085.202.11.2010
[2011/31]
WO2010JP69501
Priority number, dateJP2009026097716.11.2009         Original published format: JP 2009260977
[2011/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011058910
Date:19.05.2011
Language:JA
[2011/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2352117
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, A63F13/12, G06T19/00
[2012/23]
Former International [2011/31]G06T/
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/31]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2011/31]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM[2011/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATION, PROGRAMME ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATION[2011/31]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2011Translation filed 
15.04.2011National basic fee paid 
15.04.2011Search fee paid 
15.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
19.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
31.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination16.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0677/17
28.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1060772  (MIXED REALITY SYSTEMS LAB INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0113]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0129] * [I] 3,5;
 [A]EP1262213  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2000353248  (MR SYSTEM KENKYUSHO KK);
 [Y]JP2005049996  (CANON KK)
by applicantJP2008510254
 JP2006209334