Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2352117 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2352117



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 469
14.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
14.01.2020 Claims Appeal 2
14.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.01.2020 Claims Appeal 1
13.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
13.01.2020 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
13.01.2020 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
16.12.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 11
29.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.11.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
25.11.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.01.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
27.09.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.03.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.03.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
16.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
31.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
31.10.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
31.10.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
31.10.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
31.10.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Description Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
11.04.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
07.04.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
30.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.09.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.09.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
11.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
10.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
19.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.11.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.11.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
19.11.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
05.06.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
24.05.2012 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.05.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.05.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
07.05.2012 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
24.04.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.06.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.06.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
19.05.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 35
10.05.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.05.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.04.2011 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 44
20.04.2011 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 44
11.04.2011 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.03.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
25.03.2011 Description Search / examination 28
25.03.2011 Drawings Search / examination 9
25.03.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4