Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2352117


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.03.2017 Change: Appeal number
03.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
16.12.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
16.12.2016 New entry: Appeal number
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
06.04.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.09.2014 First examination report
18.04.2014 Change - representative published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
03.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2013 Change - extension states published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
27.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2012 Amendment by applicant
04.05.2012 Supplementary search report published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
04.05.2012 Change - classification published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
04.05.2012 Change - classification published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
01.07.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
01.07.2011 Request for examination filed published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
29.06.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.06.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
02.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
02.05.2011 Amendment by applicant
06.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2011 PCT data prior to European publication