EP2485556 - METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR SENDING UPLINK RESOURCE SCHEDULING REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Academy of Telecommunications Technology 40, Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Xueming No. 29 Xueyuan Rd Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
LI, Guoqing No. 29 Xueyuan Rd Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Yanan No. 29 Xueyuan Rd Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Priori, Enrico, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Priori, Enrico, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10819865.6 | 15.09.2010 | WO2010CN76933 | Priority number, date | CN20091235256 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: CN200910235256 | [2012/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011038636 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485556 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W74/04 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L5/1469 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG ZUR SENDUNG VON UPLINK-RESSOURCEN-PLANUNGSANFRAGEN | [2012/32] | English: | METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR SENDING UPLINK RESOURCE SCHEDULING REQUEST | [2012/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR PERMETTANT D'ENVOYER UNE REQUÊTE DE PLANIFICATION DE RESSOURCES EN LIAISON MONTANTE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2012 | Translation filed | 05.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 26.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090901), no. V8.8.0, pages 1 - 81, XP050377563 [Y] 1-15 * page 76, lines 1-9 * * table 10.1.5 * | [Y] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Latency improvement comparison", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-094825 (LATENCY IMPROVEMENTS COMPARISON), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090818), no. Shenzhen, China; 20090818, XP050352833 [Y] 1-15 * pages 1-2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * | [Y] - ZTE, "Clarification of UE-specific time domain position for SR transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-084646 CLARIFICATION OF UE-SPECIFIC TIME DOMAIN POSITION FOR SR TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081118), no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20081118, XP050317876 [Y] 1-15 * page 5, lines 1-10 * * table 10.1.5 * | [Y] - INTERDIGITAL, "Contention Based UL Transmission foe Dormant to Active State Transition", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-094215, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090818), no. Shenzhen, China; 20090818, XP050352484 [Y] 1-15 * pages 4-5, paragraph 2.2 * | [XP] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Add shorter SR periodicity", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-095112_36213_CR0257R1_(REL-9)_ON SR PERIODICITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050389431 [XP] 1,6,11 * page 6, lines 9-15 * * table 10.1.5 * | International search | [A]WO2007148932 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al); | [A]CN101355788 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101426271 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]); | [A]CN101489305 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]) |