Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2488283

EP2488283 - ADDITIVE TO UREA SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.07.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yara International ASA
Drammensveien 131
0277 Oslo / NO
[2017/07]
Former [2012/34]For all designated states
PROPPABORT AB
Strångsjövagen 3
641 92 Katrineholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Sebelius, Sara
Utgardsvägen 20
136 43 Handen / SE
 [2012/34]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Carlsson, Carl Fredrik Munk
Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date10823687.801.10.2010
WO2010SE51057
Priority number, dateSE2009000132916.10.2009         Original published format: SE 0901329
SE2010000040421.04.2010         Original published format: SE 1000404
[2012/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011046491
Date:21.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2488283
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011
[2012/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2488283
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.04.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94, B01D53/56, F01N3/20
[2012/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ADDITIV FÜR HARNSTOFFLÖSUNGEN[2014/34]
English:ADDITIVE TO UREA SOLUTIONS[2012/34]
French:ADDITIF POUR SOLUTIONS D'URÉE[2012/34]
Former [2012/34]ZUSATZSTOFF FÜR HARNSTOFFLÖSUNGEN
Entry into regional phase07.05.2012National basic fee paid 
07.05.2012Search fee paid 
07.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/34]
12.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2014Fee for grant paid
11.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.09.2015  28.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Total Marketing Services
24 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Corizzi, Valérie
PACT-IP
37, rue Royale
92210 Saint-Cloud / FR
 [2018/19]
Former [2015/44]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2015   
Total Marketing Services
24 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Corizzi, Valérie
Innovation Competence Group
310 avenue Berthelot
69008 Lyon / FR
30.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2207/17
28.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.10.2010
AL24.12.2014
AT24.12.2014
BE24.12.2014
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MK24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
PT24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/37]HU01.10.2010
AT24.12.2014
BE24.12.2014
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MK24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
PT24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2018/30]HU01.10.2010
AT24.12.2014
BE24.12.2014
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MK24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2017/38]HU01.10.2010
AT24.12.2014
BE24.12.2014
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
SM24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2016/28]AT24.12.2014
BE24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2016/24]AT24.12.2014
BE24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2016/12]AT24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SI24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2016/03]AT24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
IT24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/50]AT24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
DK24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/38]AT24.12.2014
CZ24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/35]EE24.12.2014
ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/33]ES24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/29]FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
NL24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI24.12.2014
HR24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
RS24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
Former [2015/20]LT24.12.2014
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US2004115110  (RIPPER, WOLFGANG ET AL);
 [A]CA2679088  (TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING)