Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2494597

EP2494597 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co, Ltd.
398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa, 243-0036 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]For all designated states
Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co, Ltd.
398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAZAKI, Shunpei
c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
02 / KOYAMA, Jun
c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
03 / KATO, Kiyoshi
c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
 [2012/36]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10826501.805.10.2010
WO2010JP67811
Priority number, dateJP2009025127530.10.2009         Original published format: JP 2009251275
[2012/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011052367
Date:05.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2494597
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011
[2012/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/8242, H01L21/8247, H01L27/10, H01L27/108, H01L27/115, H01L29/786, H01L29/788, H01L29/792, G11C11/404, G11C11/405, G11C16/02, H01L27/02, H01L27/088, H01L27/105, H01L27/12
[2015/12]
Former International [2012/36]H01L21/8242, H01L21/8247, H01L27/10, H01L27/108, H01L27/115, H01L29/786, H01L29/788, H01L29/792
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/36]
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT[2012/36]
English:SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE[2012/36]
French:DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2012/36]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2012National basic fee paid 
29.05.2012Search fee paid 
29.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/36]
27.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2011055660  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP], et al) [E] 1,4-15 * paragraphs [0195] - [0254]; figures 16,17 *;
 [XI]US6570206  (SAKATA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,10-15 * column 5, line 18 - column 14, line 30; figures 1-15 * [I] 8
International search[X]JP2007042172  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JPH10284696  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2007157982  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]WO0173846  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2009021536  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD);
 [A]JP2002328617  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB)