Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2497996

EP2497996 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, FR, GB, LI
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nalux Co. Ltd.
3-4-29 Minami-eguchi Higashi-yodogawa-ku
Osaka 533-0003 / JP
[2012/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KANAI, Norifumi
c/o NALUX CO. LTD.
Yamazaki Head Office
2-1-7 Yamazaki
Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun Osaka 618-0001 / JP
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Allain, Laurent , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2018/33]
Former [2012/37]Allain, Laurent , et al
Ferray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc
FR-92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date10828030.609.04.2010
[2018/33]
WO2010JP02625
Priority number, dateUS20090257959P04.11.2009         Original published format: US 257959 P
US20100292950P07.01.2010         Original published format: US 292950 P
[2012/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011055467
Date:12.05.2011
Language:JA
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2497996
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2497996
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:F21V5/04, G02B19/00, F21V7/00, G02F1/1335, H01L33/58, // F21Y105/00, F21Y105/10, F21Y115/10
[2017/14]
Former International [2012/37]F21V5/04, F21Y101/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2012/37]
English:LIGHTING DEVICE[2012/37]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2012/37]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2012Translation filed 
31.05.2012National basic fee paid 
31.05.2012Search fee paid 
31.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
31.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2018Fee for grant paid
04.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2018
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
03.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
03.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
GB09.04.2019
LU09.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
FR30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2020/04]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
LU09.04.2019
Former [2020/02]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006126343  (HSIEH MIN-HSUN [TW] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * figures 4,5,6,7 *;
 [I]KR20060040502  (LUXPIA CO [KR]) [I] 1 * figures 4,5,6 *;
 [I]DE102005019832  (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1 * figures 1A,1B,1C *;
 [I]US2007047232  (KIM JIN J [KR] ET AL) [I] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [I]EP1818706  (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1 * figures 1,2,15,25 *;
 [I]US2009067179  (CHAVES JULIO CESAR [ES] ET AL) [I] 15 * figures 1-38 *
International search[A]JP2009021086  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0626270U  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD.)
by applicantUS6543911
 US6899443
 JP2008226702