Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2500366

EP2500366 - AQUEOUS POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE EMULSION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AQUEOUS POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE DISPERSION OBTAINED USING THE EMULSION, POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE FINE POWDER, AND STRETCH-EXPANDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.02.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGC Inc.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[2018/39]
Former [2012/38]For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company, Limited
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIGUCHI, Shinya
c/o Asahi Glass Company
Limited
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
02 / MATSUOKA, Yasuhiko
c/o Asahi Glass Company
Limited
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Shigeki
c/o Asahi Glass Company
Limited
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/38]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date10828382.108.11.2010
WO2010JP69863
Priority number, dateJP2009025594909.11.2009         Original published format: JP 2009255949
[2012/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011055824
Date:12.05.2011
Language:JA
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2500366
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2500366
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08F214/26, C08F2/24, C08J9/00
[2012/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENEMULSION UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, AUS DER EMULSION GEWONNENE WÄSSRIGE POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENDISPERSION, FEINES POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENPULVER UND STRECKGEDEHNTER KÖRPER[2012/38]
English:AQUEOUS POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE EMULSION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AQUEOUS POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE DISPERSION OBTAINED USING THE EMULSION, POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE FINE POWDER, AND STRETCH-EXPANDED BODY[2012/38]
French:ÉMULSION AQUEUSE DE POLYTÉTRAFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE POLYTÉTRAFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE OBTENUE À L'AIDE DE L'ÉMULSION, POUDRE FINE DE POLYTÉTRAFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE ET CORPS EXPANSÉ ÉTIRÉ[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2012Translation filed 
22.03.2012National basic fee paid 
22.03.2012Search fee paid 
22.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
04.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2013Fee for grant paid
02.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.10.2014  24.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2015/03]
Former [2014/49]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.2014  24.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Wolf, Matthias, et al
Hoffmann · Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
DE-81925 München / DE
14.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0942/17
28.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.11.2010
AL08.01.2014
AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MK08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
SM08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU08.11.2010
AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MK08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
SM08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU08.11.2010
AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
SM08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU08.11.2010
AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
SM08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
Former [2016/28]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
SM08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
Former [2016/22]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
SM08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
Former [2015/51]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/24]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
RS08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH11240917  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [AD] 1-9 * example 1; claim - *;
 [A]WO2007005361  (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP1942118  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim - * * paragraph [0014] * * examples 1-2 *
International search[X]WO2007046345  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPH11240917  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD)
by applicantUS2007015865
 US2008269408
 WO2009014136
 JPH11240917
 US5470655
 US4576869
 JP2009255949
    - Div. Polymer Chem., Preprints, AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1966), vol. 7, page 1116
    - J. POLYMER SCI., A, (1970), vol. 1, no. 8, page 2441
    - ZH. PRIKL. KHIM., (1984), vol. 57, page 1126