Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2494446

EP2494446 - USING FILE PREVALENCE TO INFORM AGRESSIVENESS OF BEHAVIORAL HEURISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.08.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Symantec Corporation
350 Ellis Street
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2012/36]
Inventor(s)01 / CONRAD, Robert
6174 Buckingham Parkway
Unit 209
Culver City CA 90230 / US
02 / CHEN, Joseph
6605 S. Sherbourne Drive
Los Angleles CA 90056 / US
 [2012/36]
Representative(s)Lavoix
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Lieb, Fabian , et al
Lavoix Bayerstraße 85a
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date10828858.026.10.2010
WO2010US54129
Priority number, dateUS2009060616326.10.2009         Original published format: US 606163
[2012/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011056592
Date:12.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2494446
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011
[2012/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00, G06F21/56, H04L29/06
[2013/34]
Former International [2012/36]G06F11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/36]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON DATEIENPRÄVALENZEN ZUR INFORMATION ÜBER DIE AGGRESSIVITÄT VON VERHALTENSHEURISTIKEN[2012/36]
English:USING FILE PREVALENCE TO INFORM AGRESSIVENESS OF BEHAVIORAL HEURISTICS[2012/36]
French:UTILISATION DE LA PRÉVALENCE DE FICHIERS VISANT À DÉTERMINER L'AGRESSIVITÉ D'UNE HEURISTIQUE À BASE COMPORTEMENTALE[2012/36]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2012National basic fee paid 
04.05.2012Search fee paid 
04.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/36]
05.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.05.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination14.07.2016Appeal received No.  T2386/16
22.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]US7509680  (SALLAM AHMED [US]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - line 42 * * column 3, line 52 - line 61 * * column 4, line 10 - line 54 * * claims 1-24 *;
 [A]US2004117648  (KISSEL TIMO S [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008027891  (REPASI ROLF [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2009172815  (GU GUOFEI [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008263659  (ALME CHRISTOPH [DE]);
 [A]US2009187992  (POSTON ROBERT J [GB])
by applicantUS7509680
 US2004117648