Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2499282

EP2499282 - GAMMA-SECRETASE MODULATORY COMPOUNDS, METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING SAME, AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.02.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NeuroGenetic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
445 Marine View Avenue, Suite 101
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
For all designated states
Kounnas, Maria Z.
3752 Vista de la Bahia
San Diego, California 92117 / US
For all designated states
Ackerman, Elizabeth J.
14030 Crest Way
Del Mar, California 92014 / US
For all designated states
Stauderman, Kenneth A.
3615 Lotus Drive
San Diego, California 92106 / US
For all designated states
Velicelebi, Gonul
4688 Tarantella Lane
San Diego, California 92130 / US
For all designated states
Wagner, Steve
2315 Wilbur Avenue
San Diego, California 92109 / US
[2012/38]
Inventor(s)01 / KOUNNAS, Maria Z.
13917 Kerry Lane
San Diego, California 92130 / US
02 / ACKERMAN, Elizabeth J.
14030 Crest Way
Del Mar, California 92014 / US
03 / STAUDERMAN, Kenneth A.
3615 Lotus Drive
San Diego, California 92106 / US
04 / VELICELEBI, Gonul
4688 Tarantella Lane
San Diego, California 92130 / US
05 / WAGNER, Steve
2315 Wilbur Avenue
San Diego, California 92109 / US
 [2012/45]
Former [2012/38]01 / KOUNNAS, Maria Z.
3752 Vista de la Bahia
San Diego, California 92117 / US
02 / ACKERMAN, Elizabeth J.
14030 Crest Way
Del Mar, California 92014 / US
03 / STAUDERMAN, Kenneth A.
3615 Lotus Drive
San Diego, California 92106 / US
04 / VELICELEBI, Gonul
4688 Tarantella Lane
San Diego, California 92130 / US
05 / WAGNER, Steve
2315 Wilbur Avenue
San Diego, California 92109 / US
Representative(s)Lord, Hilton David
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[2015/17]
Former [2012/38]Lord, Hilton David
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date10829246.708.11.2010
WO2010US55869
Priority number, dateUS20090259570P09.11.2009         Original published format: US 259570 P
[2012/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011057214
Date:12.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2499282
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011
[2012/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2499282
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.06.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2013/33]
Former International [2012/38]C40B30/06, G01N33/53
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GAMMA-SEKRETASE-MODULIERENDE VERBINDUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER IDENTIFIKATION UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR[2012/38]
English:GAMMA-SECRETASE MODULATORY COMPOUNDS, METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING SAME, AND USES THEREFOR[2012/38]
French:COMPOSÉS DE MODULATION DE LA GAMMA-SÉCRÉTASE, PROCÉDÉS POUR LES IDENTIFIER, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2012National basic fee paid 
11.06.2012Search fee paid 
11.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
25.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2015Fee for grant paid
12.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.12.2013
Opposition(s)25.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.11.2010
AL22.04.2015
AT22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE08.11.2015
LU08.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU08.11.2010
AT22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE08.11.2015
LU08.11.2015
Former [2017/38]HU08.11.2010
AT22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE08.11.2015
LU08.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE08.11.2015
LU08.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
LU08.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2007092861  (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract; p. 3, l. 9-11 *;
 [Y]WO2006112550  (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * p. 6, par. 1; claim 1;Example 8; Fig. 7C *;
 [X]  E. CZIRR ET AL, "Independent Generation of A 42 and A 38 Peptide Species by -Secretase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20080417), vol. 283, no. 25, doi:10.1074/jbc.M802912200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17049 - 17054, XP055069272 [X] 1-6 * abstract; p. 17049, col. 2, par. 2;p. 17050; Figs. 1-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M802912200
International search[Y]EP1821103  (CELLZOME AG [DE]);
 [Y]US2009105345  (HO CHIH YUNG [US]);
 [A]  - YANG ET AL., "Quantitification of gamma-secretase modulation differentiates inhibitor compound selectively between two substrates Notch and amyloid precursor protein.", MOLECULAR BRAIN, (2008), vol. 1, XP008159025

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-6606-1-15
Examination   Maria Z. Kounnas ET AL, "Modulation of [gamma]-Secretase Reduces [beta]-Amyloid Deposition in a Transgenic Mouse Model of Alzheimer's Disease", Neuron, (20100909), vol. 67, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.neuron.2010.08.018, ISSN 0896-6273, pages 769 - 780, XP055093240

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2010.08.018
by applicantWO2004018997
 US4328245
 US4409239
 US4410545
 USRE28819E
 US4358603
 US6267983
 US6261595
 US6256533
 US6167301
 US6024975
 US6010715
 US5985317
 US5983134
 US5948433
 US5860957
 US6316652
 US6274552
 US6271359
 US6253872
 US6139865
 US6131570
 US6120751
 US6071495
 US6060082
 US6048736
 US6039975
 US6004534
 US5985307
 US5972366
 US5900252
 US5840674
 US5759542
 US5709874
 US4522811
    - NOGRADY, Medicinal Chemistry A Biochemical Approach, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, pages 388 - 392,
    - ANSEL, Introduction to Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, 4th ed., page 126,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 15th ed., MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY,
    - MARAMBAUD ET AL., EMBO, (2002), vol. 21, pages 1948 - 1956,