Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2500882

EP2500882 - FIRE AND FLAMMABLE GAS ALARM SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tianjin Puhai New Technology Co., Ltd.
3-4F, Building 7, NO.6, Ziyuan Road
Huayuan Industry Development Area
Tianjin, 300384 / CN
[2018/20]
Former [2012/38]For all designated states
Tianjin Puhai New Technology Co., Ltd.
6th Room CD Building D1 Xinmao Science Skill Park Hua Yuan Industry Development Area Nankai District
Tianjin 300384 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Lezhong
6th Room CD Building D1
Xinmao Science Skill Park
Hua Yuan Industry Development Area
Nankai District
Tianjin 300384 / CN
02 / NIU, Jun
6th Room CD Building D1
Xinmao Science Skill Park
Hua Yuan Industry Development Area
Nankai District
Tianjin 300384 / CN
03 / SUN, Hongyun
6th Room CD Building D1
Xinmao Science Skill Park
Hua Yuan Industry Development Area
Nankai District
Tianjin 300384 / CN
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Grosse, Felix Christopher
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
[2012/38]
Application number, filing date10829430.721.06.2010
[2018/09]
WO2010CN00900
Priority number, dateCN20091023739110.11.2009         Original published format: CN200910237391
[2012/38]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011057465
Date:19.05.2011
Language:ZH
[2011/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2500882
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2500882
Date:28.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G08B17/10, G08B21/16, G08B29/00, G08B17/117, G08B29/26, G08B17/00
[2015/23]
Former International [2013/28]G08B17/10, G08B21/16, G08B29/00, G08B17/117
Former International [2012/38]G08B17/10, G08B21/16, G08B29/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FEUER- UND GASENTFLAMMUNGSALARMSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2012/38]
English:FIRE AND FLAMMABLE GAS ALARM SYSTEM AND METHOD[2012/38]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALARME INCENDIE ET DE GAZ INFLAMMABLE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2012Translation filed 
11.06.2012National basic fee paid 
11.06.2012Search fee paid 
11.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
12.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2018Fee for grant paid
19.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2015
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
03.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201708   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
AT21.06.2018
GB21.06.2018
IE21.06.2018
LU21.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
FR30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2020/03]
Former [2019/23]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
GB21.06.2018
IE21.06.2018
LU21.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
FR30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/21]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
GB21.06.2018
IE21.06.2018
LU21.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/19]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
IE21.06.2018
LU21.06.2018
Former [2019/17]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
LU21.06.2018
Former [2019/15]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001040509  (DUNGAN BUD [US] DUNGAN CORNELIUS P [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0058] - [0068] - [0078] - [0087] - [0138] - [0140] - [0170] , [0174] - [0177]; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]WO2005001788  (PRONET GMBH [DE]; BURGHARDT CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * page 14, line 27 - page 17, line 27 *;
 [X]US6107925  (WONG JACOB Y [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 8, line 30 - column 12, line 26 *;
 [X]EP0608840  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; RWE ENERGIE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 54 *;
 [A]EP0548751  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 13 - line 15, paragraph 4 *
International search[XP]CN101719299  (TIANJIN PUHAI NEW TECHNOLOGY CO. LT.);
 [Y]CN101251942  (UNIV. HUANAN SCI. & EN.);
 [Y]CN1239795  (YIAI FIRE FIGHTING ELECTRONICS CO. LT.);
 [A]US5376924  (HOCHIKICO.);
 [A]JPH1063965  (NOHMI BOSAI LTD.)