Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2499840

EP2499840 - ELECTRO ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EHRLUND, Göran
Gruvberget 6
783 93 Stora Skedvi / SE
[2012/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Brann AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Former [2012/38]Franks, Barry Gerard
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date10830277.910.11.2010
WO2010SE51236
Priority number, dateSE2009005084710.11.2009         Original published format: SE 0950847
[2012/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011059384
Date:19.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2499840
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011
[2012/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04R19/04
[2012/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER[2012/38]
English:ELECTRO ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER[2012/38]
French:TRANSDUCTEUR ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUE[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2012National basic fee paid 
09.05.2012Search fee paid 
09.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
19.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
24.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2004222091  (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS; AUDIO TECHNICA KK) [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * figures 1-6 * [Y] 3,5,6;
 [Y]US2006140423  (TANABE HARUHISA [JP] ET AL) [Y] 3,6 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1, 4, 6 *;
 [YD]WO2007004981  (EHRLUND GOERAN [SE]) [YD] 5 * page 1, lines 3-4; figures 2, 3a, 3b *
International search[Y]WO2007004981  (EHRLUND, GÖRAN);
 [Y]US4436648  (KHANNA S.K. ET AL);
 [A]US5949892  (STEWART B.B.);
 [A]EP1569498  (BSE CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2008115643  (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS, LLC);
 [A]US2005089188  (FENG J.N.);
 [A]US2009097687  (COLLINS J.S.);
 [A]US2005189635  (HUMPSTON G. ET AL);
 [A]US3814864  (VICTOREEN J.A.);
 [A]US4776019  (MIYATAKE K.)