Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2501340

EP2501340 - PROSTHETIC CONDYLAR JOINTS WITH ARTICULATING BEARING SURFACES HAVING A TRANSLATING CONTACT POINT DURING ROTATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New York Society for the Ruptured and Crippled Maintaining the Hospital for Special Surgery
535 East 70th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
[2012/39]
Inventor(s)01 / LIPMAN, Joseph, D.
165 West 91st Street Apt. 7G
New York, NY 10024 / US
02 / BARTEL, Donald, L.
10 Quarry Road
Ithaca, NY 14850 / US
03 / WRIGHT, Timothy, M.
85 East End Avenue Apt. 9C
New York, NY 10028 / US
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2017/03]
Former [2012/39]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date10830915.416.11.2010
[2017/03]
WO2010US56878
Priority number, dateUS20090261575P16.11.2009         Original published format: US 261575 P
US20090281362P16.11.2009         Original published format: US 281362 P
[2012/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011060434
Date:19.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2501340
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2501340
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61F2/38, A61F2/42
[2012/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROTHETISCHE KONDYLUSGELENKE MIT GELENKIGEN LAGERFLÄCHEN MIT TRANSLATIONSKONTAKTSTELLE WÄHREND DER ROTATION[2012/39]
English:PROSTHETIC CONDYLAR JOINTS WITH ARTICULATING BEARING SURFACES HAVING A TRANSLATING CONTACT POINT DURING ROTATION THEREOF[2012/39]
French:ARTICULATIONS CONDYLIENNES PROTHÉTIQUES AVEC DES SURFACES D'APPUI S'ARTICULANT COMPORTANT UN POINT DE CONTACT QUI SE TRANSLATE PENDANT LEUR ROTATION[2012/39]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2012National basic fee paid 
15.06.2012Search fee paid 
15.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
22.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.11.2016Fee for grant paid
11.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
08.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16200872.6  / EP3158976
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2015
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.11.2010
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MK18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/46]HU16.11.2010
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2019/31]HU16.11.2010
AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/33]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US5609643  (COLLERAN DENNIS P [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 7, lines 31-43 *;
 [A]EP1132063  (BIOMEDICAL ENG TRUST INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]EP1174099  (TAKEI TSUNENORI [JP]; NAKASHIMA PROPELLER CO LTD [JP]; YAMADA HAJIME [) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] *
International search[A]US5871546  (COLLERAN; DENNIS P. ET AL.);
 [A]US6039764  (POTTENGER; LAWRENCE A. ET AL.);
 [A]US5330534  (HERRINGTON; STEPHEN M. ET AL.);
 [A]WO9623460  (NEW YORK SOCIETY FOR THE RUPTURED AND CRIPPLED MAINTAINING T HE HOSPIT);
 [A]US2004143339  (AXELSON; STUART L. ET AL.);
 [A]US5326361  (HOLLISTER; ANNE)