Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2502928

EP2502928 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION, COSMETIC COMPOSITION OR FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION PRODUCED BY THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kewpie Kabushiki Kaisha (also Trading As Kewpie Corporation)
4-13 Shibuya 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0002 / JP
[2017/45]
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Kewpie Kabushiki Kaisha (also Trading As Kewpie Corporation)
4-13 Shibuya 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIMURA Ae
c/o Kewpie Corporation
R&D Division
13-1, Sumiyoshi-cho 5-chome
Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-0034 / JP
02 / YOSHIDA Hideto
c/o Kewpie Corporation
R&D Division
13-1, Sumiyoshi-cho 5-chome
Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-0034 / JP
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2014/34]
Former [2014/16]Ritthaler, Wolfgang
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2012/39]KATZAROV S.A.
European Patent Attorneys 19, rue des Epinettes
1227 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date10831394.124.09.2010
[2017/45]
WO2010JP66511
Priority number, dateJP2009026490720.11.2009         Original published format: JP 2009264907
[2012/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011061995
Date:26.05.2011
Language:JA
[2011/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2502928
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2502928
Date:08.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23L33/10, A23L33/12, A23D7/01, A23L2/52, A23J7/00, A61K8/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/98, C07F9/10, A61K9/127, A61K8/55
[2017/20]
Former International [2012/39]C07F9/10, A23J7/00, A23L1/30, A61K8/55, A61K8/92, A61K8/98, A61K9/10, A61K9/127, A61K47/44, A61Q19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GEREINIGTEN EIGELB-PHOSPHOLIPID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ODER LEBENSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DER IN DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTEN EIGELB-PHOSPHOLIPID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2012/39]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION, COSMETIC COMPOSITION OR FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION PRODUCED BY THE PROCESS[2012/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' OEUF PURIFIÉ, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE, COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE OU COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' OEUF PURIFIÉ OBTENUE PAR LE PROCÉDÉ[2017/20]
Former [2012/39]PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' UF PURIFIÉ, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE, COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE OU COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' UF PURIFIÉ OBTENUE PAR LE PROCÉDÉ
Entry into regional phase24.05.2012Translation filed 
20.06.2012National basic fee paid 
20.06.2012Search fee paid 
20.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
31.12.2012Observations by third parties
07.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2017Fee for grant paid
25.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2015
Opposition(s)09.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
02.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
03.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/23]AT08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
NO08.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2004014144  (SOLAE LLC [US]; MAYNES JONATHAN [US]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, lines 2-7,20-33 * * page 4, lines 1-20 * * page 5, lines 25-30,33-34 * * page 6, lines 29-31 * * claim 7 *;
 [A]WO0000038  (MICHAEL FOODS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Zardi-e- Baiz Neem Brist", TKDL,, (18960101), XP003029296 [X] 7,9 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Nuskha Bara--e Jhaeen Wa Kalaf", TKDL,, (19110101), XP003029297 [X] 7,8 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Tila Baiza Biryan", TKDL,, (18960101), XP003029298 [X] 7,8 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Matbookh Zardi-e- Baiz", TKDL,, (18960101), XP003029299 [X] 7,9 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2005272380  (Q P CORP);
 [A]JPH09224584  (Q P CORP);
 [A]JPH09167  (KAO CORP)
by applicantJPS6239593
 JP2005272380
    - Science of Egg (Tamago-no-kagaku, ASAKURA PUBLISHING CO., LTD
other   - "Zardi-e- Baiz Neem Brist", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/619A, XP003029296
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, pages 399 - 400
    - "Nuskha Bara-e Jhaeen Wa Kalaf", TKDL, Database accession no. NA2/214W, XP003029297
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. I, page 617
    - "Tila-e- Baiza Bara-e- Kalf", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/619A3, XP003029298
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 400
    - "Matbookh Zardi-e- Baiz", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/619D, XP003029299