Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2503639

EP2503639 - INSTALLATION METHOD OF RADIATING ELEMENTS DISPOSED ON DIFFERENT PLANES AND ANTENNA USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.09.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KMW Inc.
65, Yeongcheon-ri Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si
Gyronggi-do 445-813 / KR
[2012/39]
Inventor(s)01 / MOON, Young-chan
c/o KMW Inc.
65, Yeongcheon-ri
Dongtan-myeon
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR
02 / CHOI, Oh-Seog
c/o KMW Inc.
65, Yeongcheon-ri
Dongtan-myeon
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR
03 / SO, Sung-Hwan
c/o KMW Inc.
65, Yeongcheon-ri
Dongtan-myeon
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR
04 / JUNG, In-Ha
c/o KMW Inc.
65, Yeongcheon-ri
Dongtan-myeon
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR
05 / HAN, Seung-Mok
c/o KMW Inc.
65, Yeongcheon-ri
Dongtan-myeon
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10831783.517.11.2010
WO2010KR08139
Priority number, dateKR2009011069617.11.2009         Original published format: KR 20090110696
[2012/39]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011062416
Date:26.05.2011
Language:KO
[2011/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2503639
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.09.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01Q9/16, H01Q21/10, H01Q5/00, H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04, H01Q21/24
[2013/28]
Former International [2012/39]H01Q9/16, H01Q21/10, H01Q5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
TitleGerman:INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR AUF VERSCHIEDENEN EBENEN ANGEORDNETE STRAHLUNGSELEMENTE UND ANTENNE DAMIT[2012/39]
English:INSTALLATION METHOD OF RADIATING ELEMENTS DISPOSED ON DIFFERENT PLANES AND ANTENNA USING SAME[2012/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'ÉLÉMENTS RAYONNANTS PLACÉS SUR DES PLANS DIFFÉRENTS ET ANTENNE UTILISANT CE PROCÉDÉ[2012/39]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2012Translation filed 
30.03.2012National basic fee paid 
30.03.2012Search fee paid 
30.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
07.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2279/15
30.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006114168  (GOTTL MAXIMILIAN [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057]; figures 7,8 *;
 [Y]US5801600  (BUTLAND ROGER JOHN [NZ] ET AL) [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * column 3, line 1 - line 60; figure 2 * * column 4, line 62 - line 20; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP1544944  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US6188373  (MARTEK GARY ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * column 10, line 25 - column 12, line 16; figure 6 * * column 13, line 47 - column 14, line 32; figure 7 * * column 19, line 39 - column 20, line 17; figures 9, 9A *;
 [A]US5877660  (EBINE YOSHIO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * column 2, line 44 - line 63; figure 2 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 7; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO03065505  (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]; GOETTL MAXIMILIAN [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * page 15, line 32 - page 16, line 4; figures 13,14 *;
 [A]US2003011529  (GOETTL MAXIMILIAN [US] GOETTL MAXIMILIAN [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0044]; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]WO2008136408  (NEC CORP) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [AP]US2010127939  (YUSA HIROYUKI [JP]) [AP] 1;
 [A]EP1739848  (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-3 *
International search[Y]KR20070083723  (KATHREIN-WERKE AG);
 [Y]KR930020441U  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [Y]KR20050088753  (K.M.W. INC.);
 [A]KR20060104786  (KTFREETEL CO., LTD. ET AL.);
 [A]US2005104795  (VOIGTLAENDER, KLAUS)