Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2517162

EP2517162 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATED BUILDING SERVICES DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aea Integration
3035 South 72nd Street
Omaha, Nebraska 68124 / US
[2012/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNACKEL, Gregory R.
3105 Armbrust Drive
Omaha Nebraska 68124 / US
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Thurston, Mark , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date10835281.622.12.2010
WO2010US61905
Priority number, dateUS20090289892P23.12.2009         Original published format: US 289892 P
[2012/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011079229
Date:30.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2517162
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.01.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00, G06F17/50, G06Q10/06
[2013/46]
Former International [2012/44]G06Q30/00, G06F17/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/44]
Extension statesBA20.07.2012
ME20.07.2012
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN AUTOMATISIERTEN ENTWURF VON KONSTRUKTIONSDIENSTEN[2012/44]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATED BUILDING SERVICES DESIGN[2012/44]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONCEPTION AUTOMATIQUE DE SERVICES DE CONSTRUCTION[2012/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2012National basic fee paid 
05.02.2013Search fee paid 
17.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
15.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
09.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0769/17
28.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
05.02.2013Request for further processing filed
05.02.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.02.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US6859768  (WAKELAM ROBERT BRUCE [US], et al);
 [X]US2005125204  (GARCIA GATHEN [US], et al);
 [X]US2003018492  (CARLSON RONALD M [US]);
 [A]US2007129971  (MCLEMORE ROBERT V [US], et al);
 [A]US4700317  (WATANABE TOSHINORI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2005198248  (MORIMOTO KENJI [JP], et al)