EP2510517 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACOUSTIC COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Hee-Won 246-1601 Hwanggol Ssangyong Apt. 1052-2 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR | 02 /
KOH, Jun-Ho 203-101 Hwanggolmaeul 2-danji Sinmyeong Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Sang-Mook 101-405 Woncheon 1-danji Jugong Apt. Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-370 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Gi-Sang 204-1103 Doosan Weve Apt. Banwol-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-738 / KR | 05 /
ZHIDKOV, Sergey 137-17 Vorovskogo st. Izhevsk 426063 / RU | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
JUNG, Hee-Won 246-1601 Hwanggol Ssangyong APT. 1052-2 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR | ||
02 /
KOH, Jun-Ho 203-101 Hwanggolmaeul 2-danji Sinmyeong APT. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Sang-Mook 101-405 Woncheon 1-danji Jugong APT. Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-370 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Gi-Sang 204-1103 Doosan Weve APT. Banwol-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-738 / KR | |||
05 /
ZHIDKOV, Sergey 137-17 Vorovskogo st. Izhevsk 426063 / RU | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/42] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York, YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10836217.9 | 09.12.2010 | [2017/43] | WO2010KR08811 | Priority number, date | US20090285372P | 10.12.2009 Original published format: US 285372 P | KR20100118134 | 25.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100118134 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011071322 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2510517 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2510517 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, G10L19/018, G10L21/0232 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G10L19/018 (EP,US);
G10L21/0232 (US);
G10L19/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | G10L19/018 | ||
Former IPC [2011/31] | G10L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKUSTISCHEN KOMMUNIKATION | [2012/42] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACOUSTIC COMMUNICATION | [2012/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ACOUSTIQUE | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 09.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2010 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | IE | 09.12.2017 | LU | 09.12.2017 | MT | 09.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GB | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005219068 (JONES ALED W [GB], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0069] - [0072] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0255] *; | [A]US2007064957 (PAGES JEAN-DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraphs [0103] , [ 104] , [ 113] , [ 114] *; | [A] - BONEY L ET AL, "DIGITAL WATERMARKS FOR AUDIO SIGNALS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIACOMPUTING AND SYSTEMS, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19960601), pages 473 - 480, XP002936889 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * sections 2.2 and 3.1 * | [A] - TILIKI J ET AL, "ENCODING A HIDDEN DIGITAL SIGNATURE ONTO AN AUDIO SIGNAL USING PSYCHOACOUSTIC MASKING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY, XX, XX, (19960101), vol. 7, pages 476 - 480, XP009078255 [A] 1-11 * title * * page 477, column left, line 3 - line 7; figures 1, 2 * | International search | [A]US2001044727 (NAKATOH YOSHIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US2004088160 (MANU MATHEW [KR]); | [A]US2005043830 (LEE KIRYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]KR20050054745 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |