Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2510438

EP2510438 - OPTIMIZED POWER USAGE FOR DATA NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2014
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.02.2014  [2014/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ip Infusion Inc.
1188 East Arques Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2012/42]
Inventor(s)01 / MANRAL, Vishwas
1188 East Arques Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
 [2013/03]
Former [2012/50]01 / MANRAL, Vishwas
1188 East Arques Avenue
Sunnyvale California 94085 / US
Former [2012/42]01 / MANRAL, Vishwas
11188 E. Arques Avenue
Sunnyvale California 94085 / US
Representative(s)Falk, Urs
Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A
6312 Steinhausen / CH
[2012/42]
Application number, filing date10836721.009.12.2010
WO2010US59780
Priority number, dateUS2009063661511.12.2009         Original published format: US 636615
[2012/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011072176
Date:16.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2510438
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011
[2012/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.06.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/721, H04L12/26
[2013/30]
Former International [2012/42]G06F11/00, G06F15/173
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/42]
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERTER LEISTUNGSVERBRAUCH FÜR DATENNETZE[2012/42]
English:OPTIMIZED POWER USAGE FOR DATA NETWORKS[2012/42]
French:CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE OPTIMISÉE POUR DES RÉSEAUX DE DONNÉES[2012/42]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2012National basic fee paid 
11.07.2012Search fee paid 
11.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/42]
06.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006034252  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0015] , [0017] , [0020] , [0022] , [0029] , [0035] , [0035] , [0039] , [0044] - [0051] - [0053] , [0096] , [0097] , [0103] , [0110] - [0001] * [Y] 2-10,12-20;
 [XY]  - CHABAREK J ET AL, "Power Awareness in Network Design and Routing", INFOCOM 2008. THE 27TH CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080413), ISBN 978-1-4244-2025-4, pages 457 - 465, XP031263843 [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * [Y] 2-10,12-20
 [XY]  - GUPTA M ET AL, "Greening of the Internet", COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW ACM USA, (200310), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0146-4833, pages 19 - 26, XP002699119 [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] * [Y] 2-10,12-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/863955.863959
 [Y]  - CHEN RENHAI ZHANG HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO M ET AL, "OSPF Extensions in Support of Inter-AS Multiprotocol Label Switching (MPLS) and Generalized MPLS (GMPLS) Traffic Engineering; draft-ietf-ccamp-ospf-interas-te-extension-06.txt", OSPF EXTENSIONS IN SUPPORT OF INTER-AS MULTIPROTOCOL LABEL SWITCHING (MPLS) AND GENERALIZED MPLS (GMPLS) TRAFFIC ENGINEERING; DRAFT-IETF-CCAMP-OSPF-INTERAS-TE-EXTENSION-06.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOC, (20080727), vol. ccamp, no. 6, XP015058029 [Y] 3-7,13-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] *
 [A]  - CHIARAVIGLIO L ET AL, "Energy-Aware Backbone Networks: A Case Study", COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS, 2009. ICC WORKSHOPS 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090614), ISBN 978-1-4244-3437-4, pages 1 - 5, XP031515478 [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] *
 [A]  - RESTREPO J C C ET AL, "Energy Profile Aware Routing", COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS, 2009. ICC WORKSHOPS 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090614), ISBN 978-1-4244-3437-4, pages 1 - 5, XP031515481 [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] *
 [A]  - BROWN S BHANDARE S DOSHI UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO T X ET AL, "The Energy Aware Dynamic Source Routing Protocol ; draft-brown-eadsr-00.txt", 20030623, (20030623), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015000378 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009144568  (FUNG HENRY T [US]);
 [Y]US2009252134  (SCHLICHT LUDGER [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009067335  (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [SE], et al);
 [Y]US2009285101  (LU WENHU [US])