Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2518749

EP2518749 - HORN SWITCH DEVICE AND AIRBAG DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2014  [2014/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd.
10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 550-0014 / JP
[2012/44]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAJI Naoki
c/o ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO. LTD.
Osaka Plant
11-61 Senrioka 7-chome
Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0001 / JP
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)Kilian Kilian & Partner
Aidenbachstrasse 54
81379 München / DE
[2013/09]
Former [2012/44]Kilian, Helmut
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date10839260.615.12.2010
WO2010JP72535
Priority number, dateJP2009029420325.12.2009         Original published format: JP 2009294203
[2012/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011078027
Date:30.06.2011
Language:JA
[2011/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2518749
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:H01H13/14, H01H13/08, B60R21/203
[2012/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/44]
TitleGerman:HUPENSCHALTVORRICHTUNG UND AIRBAGVORRICHTUNG[2012/44]
English:HORN SWITCH DEVICE AND AIRBAG DEVICE[2012/44]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INTERRUPTEUR DE KLAXON ET DISPOSITIF D'AIRBAG[2012/44]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2012Translation filed 
13.07.2012National basic fee paid 
13.07.2012Search fee paid 
13.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
21.11.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS61182370U  (NHK SPRING CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2007045237  (NIHON PLAST CO LTD);
 [A]JP2000276971  (NIHON PLAST CO LTD)
by applicantJP2007045237