Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2526377

EP2526377 - TRACKING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.03.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - applicantpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthosoft ULC
75 Queen Street Suite 3300
Montréal QC H3C 2N6 / CA
[2019/51]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Orthosoft, Inc.
75 Queen Street Suite 3300
Montreal, Québec H3C 2N6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / PROULX, Catherine
3964 Bannantyne, 301
Verdun Québec H4G 1C1 / CA
02 / FALARDEAU, Bruno
3964 Bannantyne, 301
Verdun Québec H4G 1C1 / CA
03 / VALIN, Myriam
284 Brien
Laval Québec H7N 3M7 / CA
04 / DESLONGCHAMPS, Julie
4395 De Bullion
Montréal Québec H2W 2G2 / CA
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)Taor, Simon Edward William
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date10843624.719.01.2010
WO2010CA00079
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011088541
Date:28.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2526377
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011
[2012/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA28.07.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01C9/00, A61B19/00, A61F2/38, G01C25/00
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
TitleGerman:TRACKING-SYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2012/48]
English:TRACKING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2012/48]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI[2012/48]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2012National basic fee paid 
08.08.2012Search fee paid 
08.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
08.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2015Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
03.08.2015Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
19.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination06.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1138/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
03.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007032748  (MCNEIL RUSSELL [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0171] * * pages 2,3 *;
 [A]US2009221937  (SMITH WARREN D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1A,1B,2 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US2009248044  (AMIOT LOUIS-PHILIPPE [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0050] *
International search[XP]WO2009117832  (PROULX);
 [A]US2008039868  (TUEMMLER ET AL.);
 [A]DE202006010728U  (AESCULAP AG & CO.);
 [A]US2004243148  (WASIELEWSKI);
 [A]US2007287911  (HAID ET AL.)