Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2507691

EP2507691 - USER INPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.08.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2012/41]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Wei
8-7-201 Xin Kang Jia Yuan
Business Development Area
Beijing 100176 / CN
02 / WANG, Kongqiao
4-8-202 Lin Cui Xi Li
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100196 / CN
03 / XIE, Xiaohui
Room 1702 NO. 1 Building 6 Moli Yuan
Beiyuan Garden
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100012 / CN
04 / LIU, Yingfei
KeXueYuanNanLi
DaTun Road
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100101 / CN
05 / WANG, Xia
14-6-203 He Qing Yuan
Tsinghua Yuan
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
06 / LIU, Huanglingzi
12G House 1 Shi-Yu-Yuan
Lan-Dian-Chang Reservation Area
Beijing 100097 / CN
07 / WANG, Bin
17-603 201 Lvyang Road
Putuo District
Shanghai 200000 / CN
08 / LIU, Zhen
37 Roundabend Road
Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US
09 / TANG, Yuezhong
13-5-501 Qinchun Jianyuan Xisanqi
Haidian District
Beijing 100096 / CN
 [2012/41]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/41]Harrison, Scott David
Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date10843654.420.01.2010
WO2010CN70286
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011088611
Date:28.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2507691
Date:10.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011
[2012/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.07.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, G06F3/048
[2012/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/41]
TitleGerman:BENUTZEREINGABE[2012/41]
English:USER INPUT[2012/41]
French:ENTRÉE D'UTILISATEUR[2012/41]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2012National basic fee paid 
06.07.2012Search fee paid 
06.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/41]
28.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination30.08.2016Appeal received No.  T0268/17
17.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009019385  (KHATIB IMTIYAZ ALTAFHUSSAIN [IN] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 1-5 *
International search[X]CN101344848  (NVIDIA CORP [US]);
 [A]CN101221477  (ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP [CN]);
 [A]US2008088582  (PREST CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al);
 [A]US2008094369  (GANATRA NITIN K [US], et al)
by applicantUS2009019385