Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2532161

EP2532161 - DE-BLOCKING FILTERING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2017/19]
Former [2012/50]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NORKIN, Andrey
Blomgatan 6
SE-169 60 Solna / SE
02 / ANDERSSON, Kenneth
Västra Trädgårdsvägen 52
SE-802 63 Gävle / SE
03 / PRIDDLE, Clinton
10/159 Clarence Road
Indooroopilly Queensland 4068 / AU
 [2012/50]
Representative(s)Ericsson , et al
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2017/19]
Former [2012/50]Sjölander, Henrik , et al
Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544
751 45 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date10845363.029.12.2010
[2017/19]
WO2010SE51494
Priority number, dateUS20100305005P16.02.2010         Original published format: US 305005 P
US20100301732P05.02.2010         Original published format: US 301732 P
[2012/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011096869
Date:11.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2532161
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011
[2012/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2532161
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE11.08.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/14, H04N19/182, H04N19/86, H04N19/82, H04N19/117, H04N19/176
[2014/14]
Former International [2012/50]H04N7/26, H04N7/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DEBLOCKIERUNGSFILTERKONTROLLE[2012/50]
English:DE-BLOCKING FILTERING CONTROL[2012/50]
French:COMMANDE DE FILTRAGE À DÉGROUPAGE[2012/50]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2012National basic fee paid 
05.09.2012Search fee paid 
05.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
05.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/50]
07.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2017Fee for grant paid
31.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.02.2016
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.12.2010
AT10.05.2017
CY10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
MK10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/46]HU29.12.2010
AT10.05.2017
CY10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU29.12.2010
AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[YDA]US2006078048  (BJONTEGAARD GISLE [NO]) [YD] 3,9,10,14,20,21 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 30] , [0 40] - [0043] * [A] 1,2,4-8,11-13,15-19,22-25;
    [XAYI] - HE Z, "Simplified H.264/AVC deblocking filter for SVC enh layer", 23. JVT MEETING; 80. MPEG MEETING; 21-04-2007 - 27-04-2007; SAN JOSÃ CR ,US; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20070419), no. JVT-W069, ISSN 0000-0153, XP030007029 [X] 1,4,5,8,11,12,15,16,19,22 * sections 2.1, 2.2, 3.1, 3.2;; figure 3 * [A] 2,6,13,17 [Y] 3,9,10,14,20,21 [I] 7,11,15,16,18,22-25
 [YA]  - BJÒONTEGAARD ET AL, "Simplified luma deblocking", 24. VCEG MEETING; 70. MPEG MEETING; 18-10-2004 - 22-10-2004; PALMA DEMALLORCA, ES; (VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP OF ITU-T SG.16),, (20041013), no. VCEG-X04, ISSN 0000-0453, XP030003421 [Y] 3,14 * section 2.1.4 * [A] 1,2,4-13,15-25
 [AD]  - LIST P ET AL, "Adaptive deblocking filter", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030701), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815175, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 614 - 619, XP011221094 [AD] 1-25 * sections II, III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815175
International search[X]US2008117980  (HUNG CHING-YU [US], et al);
 [A]WO02096117  (PACE SOFT SILICON LTD [IE], et al);
 [A]US2006110056  (GAMBHIRE PRANAV [US]);
 [A]US2008123750  (BRONSTEIN MICHAEL [IL], et al);
 [A]US2003138150  (SRINIVASAN SRIDHAR [US]);
 [A]  - MUHAMMAD NADEEM ET AL., "A high-throughput, area-efficient hardware accelerator for adaptive deblocking filter in H.264/AVC", IEEE/ACM/IFIP 7TH WORKSHOP ON EMBEDDED SYSTEMS FOR REAL-TIME MULTIMEDIA, pages 18 - 27, XP031569119
 [XP]  - UGUR K. ET AL, "High Performance, Low Complexity Video Coding and the Emerging HEVC Standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (20101118), vol. 20, no. 12, pages 1688 - 1697, XP011329410

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2010.2092613
by applicantUS2006078048