blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2547742 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2547742



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 230
04.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.07.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 1
06.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
17.12.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
11.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.12.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.08.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.08.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.04.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.04.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.04.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
06.04.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
06.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.10.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 6
19.09.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
27.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.07.2017 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
08.06.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
08.06.2017 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 5
29.05.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
12.02.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.02.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
17.07.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
16.07.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.01.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.11.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.11.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.11.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.11.2012 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
24.09.2012 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 16
24.09.2012 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 15
27.07.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.04.2012 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
22.09.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
22.09.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21