blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2547742


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.07.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.12.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.09.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.08.2018 First examination report
06.04.2018 Amendment by applicant
15.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 Change - classification published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
15.09.2017 Change - classification published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
15.09.2017 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
02.06.2017 Change - classification published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
02.06.2017 Change - classification published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
16.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2014 Change - inventor published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
22.11.2013 Change - inventor published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
04.10.2013 Change - inventor published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
16.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.09.2013 Change - representative published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
17.05.2013 Change - extension states published on  19.06.2013  [2013/25]
25.01.2013 Change - inventor published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
21.12.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
21.12.2012 Request for examination filed published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
29.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
04.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
23.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication