blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2547742 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201010130377 EP10847732



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013033458Global Dossier 07.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201010130377 14.03.2010
WO2010CN76655 07.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101663857BGlobal Dossier 07.10.2016B1
KR20120135320 12.12.2012A
Priority number Date
CN201010130377 14.03.2010
WO2010CN76655 07.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5750125BGlobal Dossier 15.07.2015B2
JP2013522398 13.06.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201010130377 14.03.2010
WO2010CN76655 07.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2547742Global Dossier 18.10.2017A4
EP2547742 23.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201010130377 14.03.2010
WO2010CN76655 07.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011113263Global Dossier 22.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
CN201010130377 14.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102190972BGlobal Dossier 29.01.2014B
CN102190972 21.09.2011A
Priority number Date
CN201010130377 14.03.2010