Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2547742

EP2547742 - MULTILAYER STRUCTURE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND TOUCH SENSITIVE DISPLAY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2018Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TPK Touch Solutions (Xiamen) Inc.
No.199 Ban Shang Road Information&Photoelectricity Park Xiamen Torch Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Yuhwen
9F-1, No.27, Jiazheng 8th St.
Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 Taiwan / CN
02 / XU, Xianbin
No.45, Jin' an LI
Huli District
Xiamen Fujian / CN
03 / YUAN, Qiong
Room 104, Building 1,
No.25, Sishui South Road
Fenyi
Fenyi County Xinyu Jiangxi / CN
04 / LIN, Fengming
Room 320, No. 531 Weili Community
Huli District
Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN
 [2014/12]
Former [2013/52]01 / LEE, Yuhwen
9F-1, No.27, Jiazheng 8th St.
Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 Taiwan / CN
02 / XU, Xianbin
No.45, Jin' an LI
Huli District
Xiamen Fujian / CN
03 / YUAN, Qiong
Room 104, Building 1,
No.25, Sishui South Road
Fenyi
Fenyi County Xinyu Jiangxi / CN
04 / LIN, Fengming
c/o TPK Touch Solutions (Xiamen) Inc.
No. 199 Ban Shang Road
Information & Photoelectricity Park
Xiamen Torch Hi-Tech, Industrial Development Zone
Xiamen Fujian 361009 / CN
Former [2013/45]01 / LEE, Yuhwen
9F-1, No.27, Jiazheng 8th St.
Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 Taiwan / CN
02 / XU, Xianbin
No.45, Jin' an LI
Huli District
Xiamen Fujian / CN
03 / YUAN, Qiong
Room 104, Building 1,
No.25, Sishui South Road
Fenyi
Fenyi County Xinyu Jiangxi / CN
04 / LIN, Fengming
c/o TPK Touch Solutions (Xiamen) Inc.
No. 199 Ban Shang Road
Information & Photoelectricity Park
Xiamen Torch Hi-Tech, Industrial Development Zone Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
Former [2013/09]01 / LEE, Yuhwen
9F-1, No.27, Jiazheng 8th St.
Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 Taiwan / CN
02 / XU, Xianbin
No.45, Jin' an LI
Huli District
Xiamen Fujian / CN
03 / YUAN, Qiong
Room 104, Building 1,
No.25, Sishui South Road
Fenyi
Fenyi County Xinyu Jiangxi / CN
04 / LIN, Fengming
No. 36, Dongda Road
Gulou District Fuzhou Fujian / CN
Former [2013/04]01 / LEE, Yuhwen
PENG Li
No.199 Ban Shang Road
Information&Photoelectricity Park of Xiamen Torch
Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone, Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
02 / XU, Xianbin
PENG Li
No.199 Ban Shang Road
Information&Photoelectricity Park of Xiamen Torch
Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone, Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
03 / YUAN, Qiong
PENG Li
No.199 Ban Shang Road
Information&Photoelectricity Park of Xiamen Torch
Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone, Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
04 / LIN, Fengming
PENG Li
No.199 Ban Shang Road
Information&Photoelectricity Park of Xiamen Torch
Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone, Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J. , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/42]Goddar, Heinz J. , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2013/04]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner
Patentanwälte
Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10847732.407.09.2010
WO2010CN76655
Priority number, dateCN20101013037714.03.2010         Original published format: CN201010130377
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011113263
Date:22.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2547742
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011
[2013/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.09.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/00, C09J7/02, G02F1/1333
[2017/42]
Former International [2017/27]C09J7/00, C09J7/02
Former International [2013/04]C09J7/02, G02F1/133
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE STRUKTUR, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHE ANZEIGE DAMIT[2013/04]
English:MULTILAYER STRUCTURE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND TOUCH SENSITIVE DISPLAY USING THE SAME[2013/04]
French:STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET AFFICHAGE TACTILE L'UTILISANT[2013/04]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2012National basic fee paid 
09.10.2012Search fee paid 
09.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
09.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
06.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004191509  (KISHIOKA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,22,23,25-33,35 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0039] , [0046] , [0053] , [0067] , [0070] , [0071]; figures 1A,1B; example 1; claims 1,4; table 1 *;
 [X]JP2009227826  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1,2,4-9,22,23,25-33,35 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0027] , [0032]; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2005233139  (ZOLLNER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,22 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]US2008280037  (SHERIDAN MARGARET M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,22 * abstract *;
 [X]EP1835003  (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 10,11,13-21,24,34 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0118]; examples 2,4; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]WO0156777  (SYLVESTER MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 10,11,13-16,24 * abstract * * page 4 - page 5; figures 2,4; claims 1,3,4,6,9,10 *
International search[X]US2004191509  (KISHIOKA HIROAKI [JP], et al);
 [Y]CN1679129  (NISSHA PRINTING [JP]);
 [X]CN101114070  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]JPH11348068  (NISSHA PRINTING)
by applicantJP2009227826
 US2005233139
 US2008280037
 EP1835003
 WO0156777