EP2603844 - FINGER IDENTIFICATION ON A TOUCHSCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/21] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Genqing Room 204, Building 5 Dong Wang Zhuang Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
SU, Hua 503, Unit 5, Building 16 Xiwangzhuang Shuangqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/21] |
Former [2013/25] | Schley, Jan Malte Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10855771.1 | 12.08.2010 | [2020/21] | WO2010CN75930 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019350 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603844 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2603844 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F3/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/03547 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/04186 (EP);
H03K17/962 (KR);
G06F2203/0338 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINGERIDENTIFIZIERUNG AUF EINEM TOUCHSCREEN | [2013/25] | English: | FINGER IDENTIFICATION ON A TOUCHSCREEN | [2013/25] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE DOIGTS SUR UN ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 18.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2010 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | IT | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | IE | 12.08.2020 | LU | 12.08.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202008000261U (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-3,13,14 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0108] * * figure - * [I] 4-12,15; | [XI]US2008316181 (NURMI MIKKO [FI]) [X] 1-5,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * figure - * [I] 6-12; | [XI]WO03017244 (MULTIDIGIT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * abstract * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 8 - line 20 * * page 12, line 8 - page 14, line 2 * * page 15, line 4 - line 20 * * page 17, line 4 - line 14 * * page 19, line 4 - page 23, line 16 * * figure - * [I] 3-12,15; | [XI]US2008042979 (NIKBIN NAVID [IR]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - * [I] 3-12,15 | International search | [X]JP2007179502 (SHARP KK); | [A]CN101118476 (E LEAD ELECTRONIC CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1759369 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | Examination | US2009287999 | by applicant | DE202008000261U | US2008316181 |