Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2633726

EP2633726 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK TRANSMIT POWER ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2018/01]
Former [2013/36]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTOFFERSSON, Jan
Stenåsvägen 13
S-975 96 Luleå / SE
02 / ERICSON, Mårten
Regnvägen 55
S-976 32 Luleå / SE
 [2013/36]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[2018/01]
Former [2013/36]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date10859037.328.10.2010
[2018/01]
WO2010SE51171
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012057663
Date:03.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2633726
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012
[2013/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2633726
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/42, H04B7/06, H04W52/14, H04W52/22, H04B7/04, // H04W52/54, H04W72/04, H04B17/12
[2015/49]
Former International [2013/36]H04W52/42, H04B7/06, H04W16/28, H04W52/10, H04W52/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG BEI UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN[2013/36]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK TRANSMIT POWER ADJUSTMENT[2013/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'AJUSTEMENT DE LA PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION MONTANTE[2013/36]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2013National basic fee paid 
05.03.2013Search fee paid 
05.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/36]
27.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.11.2017Fee for grant paid
23.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2015
Opposition(s)05.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
[2019/28]
Former [2019/13]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[IA]US2008151798  (CAMP WILLIAM O [US]) [I] 1-7,9,10,12-18,20,21 * page 1, paragraphs 1,3,5,7, 15 * * page 2, paragraphs 18-20 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 8,11,19,22;
 [A]WO2009113934  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; GERSTENBERGER DIRK [SE]; AXELSSON SAMUEL) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 5 - line 25 * * page 5, line 26 - line 32 * * page 6, line 11 - line 31 * * page 7, line 16 - line 33 * * figures 1-4 *
International search[A]US2010266063  (HAREL HAIM [US], et al);
 [E]WO2011017464  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al);
 [E]WO2011043720  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al)
 [A]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Power control for multi-antenna transmission", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #62BIS, R1-105560, XI'AN, CHINA, (20101011), pages 1 - 11, XP050450659
 [A]  - MOTOROLA, "UL-MIMO with Antenna Gain Imbalance", TSG- RAN WG1 #55BIS, R1-090327, LJUBLJANA, SLOVENIA, (20090112), pages 1 - 6, XP050597202
 [A]  - MOTOROLA, "Multi-Antenna Uplink Transmission for LTE-A", TSG-RAN WG1 #56, R1-090794, ATHENS, GREECE, (20090209), pages 1 - 6, XP050318651
 [A]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Uplink Power Control for Multi-antenna Transmission", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62BIS, R1-105431, XIAN, CHINA, (20101011), pages 1 - 8, XP050450564
by applicantUS2008151798