Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2643409

EP2643409 - HIGH FILLER LOADED POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown TX 77520-2149 / US
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Asia Pacific Research & Development Co., Ltd.
1099 Zi Xing Road
Shanghai 200241 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / TONG, Jun
No 45-1304 Lane 158, Baochen Road
Minhuang District
Shanghai 201100 / CN
02 / PENG, Xiaobo
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
03 / LI, Liang
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
04 / YING, Qi
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
 [2014/01]
Former [2013/40]01 / TONG, Jun
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
02 / PENG, Xiaobo
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
03 / LI, Liang
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
04 / YING, Qi
1099 Zi Xing Road
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
Representative(s)ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2016/23]Mareschal, Anne
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
Former [2013/40]Wall, Leythem , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2
1831 MACHELEN / BE
Application number, filing date10859912.724.11.2010
[2016/23]
WO2010CN01885
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012068703
Date:31.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2643409
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012
[2013/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2643409
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN31.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/16, C08J3/24, C08K3/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/26, C08K3/40, C08K5/14, C08K3/22
[2014/25]
Former International [2013/40]C08L23/16, C08J3/24, C08K3/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/26, C08K3/40, C08K5/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHEM FÜLLSTOFFGEHALT[2013/40]
English:HIGH FILLER LOADED POLYMER COMPOSITION[2013/40]
French:COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE HAUTEMENT CHARGÉE EN CHARGES[2013/40]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2013National basic fee paid 
20.06.2013Search fee paid 
20.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/40]
15.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2016Fee for grant paid
28.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2015
Opposition(s)09.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.11.2010
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
TR08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB24.11.2016
IE24.11.2016
MT24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU24.11.2010
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
TR08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB24.11.2016
IE24.11.2016
MT24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU24.11.2010
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB24.11.2016
IE24.11.2016
MT24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/38]HU24.11.2010
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB24.11.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU24.11.2010
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB24.11.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB24.11.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/50]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE24.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1655331  (ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1-15 * examples 4-6 *;
 [X]WO2004099309  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 8 *;
 [A]WO03011962  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 3 *;
 [X]WO2004026957  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 1 *
International search[A]WO2005049672  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO0104200  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al);
 [A]WO2004035680  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al)