Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2653425

EP2653425 - ELEVATOR DOOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI, NO
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2018/36]
Former [2013/43]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KITAZAWA, Masaya
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2018/36]
Former [2013/43]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10860697.115.12.2010
[2018/36]
WO2010JP72538
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012081090
Date:21.06.2012
Language:JA
[2012/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2653425
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2653425
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.06.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:B66B13/22, B66B13/08, B66B13/14
[2017/41]
Former International [2013/43]B66B13/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFZUGSTÜRVORRICHTUNG[2013/43]
English:ELEVATOR DOOR DEVICE[2013/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PORTE D'ASCENSEUR[2013/43]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2013Translation filed 
20.03.2013National basic fee paid 
20.03.2013Search fee paid 
20.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
26.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2018Fee for grant paid
24.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
[2019/08]
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2010137956  (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD);
 [A]JPH03186596  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JP2001294376  (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD);
 [A]JP2008024395  (HITACHI LTD, et al)
by applicantJPS60218282