blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2352017 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2352017



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
04.06.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.07.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.06.2013 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.06.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.04.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
24.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.09.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
24.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
24.09.2012 Description Search / examination 14
24.09.2012 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.03.2012 Priority search results Search / examination 2
01.03.2012 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 2
16.02.2012 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
18.01.2012 Information relating to the filing of a voluntary divisional application Search / examination 1
08.08.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.07.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 2
02.03.2011 European search report Search / examination 3
12.01.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
12.01.2011 Description Search / examination 15
12.01.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.01.2011 Drawings Search / examination 5
12.01.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
12.01.2011 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
12.05.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27