Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2352018

EP2352018 - Device for determining a dielectric property of a capacitor arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uster Technologies AG
Sonnenbergstrasse 10
8610 Uster / CH
[2011/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Gehrig, Reto
Agnesstraße 12c
8406 Winterthur / CH
 [2011/31]
Application number, filing date11000173.212.10.2009
[2011/31]
Priority number, dateCH2008000164616.10.2008         Original published format: CH 16462008
[2011/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2352018
Date:03.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2352018
Date:09.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/22, G01N33/36, G01R27/26
[2011/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/31]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung einer dielektrischen Eigenschaft einer Kondensatoranordnung[2011/31]
English:Device for determining a dielectric property of a capacitor arrangement[2011/31]
French:Dispositif de détermination d'une propriété diélectrique d'un ensemble condensateur[2011/31]
Examination procedure02.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/11]
21.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2012Fee for grant paid
21.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09748935.5  / EP2347250
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090748935) is  18.01.2012
Opposition(s)10.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2009
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU12.10.2009
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2015/32]CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2015/24]CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
SM09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/25]CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MC09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/52]CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/48]DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/41]FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/40]FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/38]FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/37]FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/36]LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
NO09.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI09.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3684954  (JAGGERS HENRY T, et al) [X] 1-3,6,10 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7-9;
 [Y]US4772844  (ANDEEN CARL G [US], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract *;
 [Y]GB1061635  (INDUSTRIAL NUCLEONICS CORP) [Y] 5 * page 2, lines 50-119; figure . *;
 [Y]US2001008478  (MCINTOSH ROBERT B [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0030] - [0034]; figures 1,5 *;
 [Y]US3757211  (GOTO T) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4706203  (RAMSDALE KURT A [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 5, lines 22-58; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE19535177  (TEMCO TEXTILMASCHKOMPONENT [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,10,11 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 18; figure 4 *;
 [YD]EP0924513  (LUWA AG ZELLWEGER [CH]) [YD] 1,2,8,10,11 * paragraph [0031]; figure 5 *;
 [A]  Helmut Lindner et al, Taschenbuch der Elektrotechnik und Elektronik, Leipzig, Carl Hanser Verlag, ISBN 3-446-22546-3, XP002624463 [A] 1 * pages 52-53; figure 2.4 *
ExaminationWO2004083813
by applicantGB638365
 EP0924513
 WO2006105676
 WO2007115416
 GB963258
 US3768006
 US3684953
 US4843879