Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2476464

EP2476464 - Backpack type firefighting device and container therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Firefighting Technology GmbH
Heggenkamp 15
49163 Bohmte / DE
[2012/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Rothbucher, Bernhard
Nonnbergstiege 1
5020 Salzburg / AT
02 / Roher, Mathias
Landstrasse 34
4020 Linz / AT
03 / Linnér, Fredrik
Stauffenstrasse 8A
5020 Salzburg / AT
04 / Kollmann, Robert
Güterweg Unterlee 362
5505 Mühlbach / AT
05 / Ranstl, Franz
Schlaming 49
5452 Pfarrwerfen / AT
 [2012/29]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/46]
Former [2012/29]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date11000244.113.01.2011
[2012/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2476464
Date:18.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2476464
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:A62C13/62, A62C13/66, A62C15/00
[2012/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/29]
TitleGerman:Rucksackartige Brandbekämpfungsvorrichtung und Behälter dafür[2012/29]
English:Backpack type firefighting device and container therefor[2012/29]
French:Dispositif de lutte contre l'incendie de type sac à dos et récipient correspondant[2012/29]
Examination procedure07.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/29]
30.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2018
19.03.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.08.2018Fee for grant paid
14.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.10.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
05.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2017
Opposition(s)15.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
LU13.01.2019
FR14.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
CH31.01.2019
LI31.01.2019
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2019/50]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
LU13.01.2019
FR14.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/49]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
LU13.01.2019
FR14.01.2019
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/44]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
LU13.01.2019
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]FR2926998  (DI VITTORIO) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,13-15,18,20 * abstract * [Y] 11,16,17,19 [I] 3,5;
 [Y]WO2006038046  (BONACIN) [Y] 11,16,17,19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0003763  (INTELAGARD INC) [A] 1-20 * abstract *