blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2364845

EP2364845 - Multilayer polyester film of high optical density, having a total thickness of maximum 60 µm and comprising two white layers and an external layer containing carbon black [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/37]Multi-layer polyester film with high optical density with a total thickness of maximum 60 µ with two white layers and a sooty external layer
[2012/31]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Opposition rejectedpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Polyester Film GmbH
Kasteler Strasse 45
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[2011/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Kliesch, Holger, Dr.
Karl-Liebknecht-Str. 21
65462 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg / DE
02 / Bothe, Lothar, Dr.
Kurt-Schumacher-Str. 69E
55124 Mainz / DE
03 / Bröder, Dirk, Dr.
Schwabenstr. 8
55444 Schweppenhausen / DE
04 / Fischer, Ingo
St. Peter Str. 49
65558 Heistenbach / DE
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)Schweitzer, Klaus, et al
Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[2011/37]
Application number, filing date11000838.003.02.2011
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateDE2010100713905.02.2010         Original published format: DE102010007139
[2011/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2364845
Date:14.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2364845
Date:12.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2011
ClassificationIPC:B32B27/18, B32B27/20, B32B27/36, A01G9/14, A01G9/22, E06B9/24, E06B9/26
[2012/31]
CPC:
B32B27/36 (EP); A01G9/1438 (EP); B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP); B32B27/20 (EP); E06B9/24 (EP);
B32B2250/244 (EP); B32B2264/102 (EP); B32B2264/108 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP); B32B2307/402 (EP); B32B2307/41 (EP);
B32B2307/416 (EP); B32B2307/518 (EP); B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/71 (EP); B32B2307/732 (EP); B32B2307/736 (EP);
B32B2410/00 (EP); B32B2451/00 (EP); B32B2457/20 (EP);
B32B2571/00 (EP); Y02A40/25 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2011/37]B32B27/18, B32B27/20, B32B27/36, A01G9/22, E06B9/26, E06B9/24, A01G9/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   SE [2012/50]
Former [2011/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtige Polyesterfolie hoher optischer Dichte mit einer Gesamtdicke von maximal 60 µm mit zwei weißen Schichten und einer rußhaltigen Außenschicht[2012/31]
English:Multilayer polyester film of high optical density, having a total thickness of maximum 60 µm and comprising two white layers and an external layer containing carbon black[2012/31]
French:Film de polyester multicouche d' une densité optique élevée ayant une épaisseur totale de 60 µm maximum avec deux couches blanches et une couche extérieure contenant du noir de carbone[2012/31]
Former [2011/37]Mehrschichtige Polyesterfolie hoher optischer Dichte mit einer Gesamtdicke von maximal 60 µ mit zwei weißen Schichten und einer rußhaltigen Außenschicht
Former [2011/37]Multi-layer polyester film with high optical density with a total thickness of maximum 60 µ with two white layers and a sooty external layer
Former [2011/37]Film de polyester multicouche ayant une densité optique élevée ayant une densité totale de 60 µ maximum avec deux couches blanches et une couche extérieure contenant de la rouille
Examination procedure27.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/17]
13.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2012Fee for grant paid
25.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.09.2013  17.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Teijin Films U.S. Limited Partnership
3600 Discovery Drive
Chester VA 23836 / US
Opponent's representative
Cockerton, Bruce Roger
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2013/43]
17.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
12.02.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.02.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.07.2019Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/43]
Appeal following opposition22.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0832/15
22.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
22.07.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
22.07.2019Date of oral proceedings
31.07.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US6436219  (FRANCIS JOHN [GB], et al) [AD] 1,14,15 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 10 * * column 7, line 26 - line 35; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP2000498  (MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012]; claim - *;
 [A]US2007054141  (FRANCIS JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10112493  (MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,14,15 * claim - *
by applicantUS6436219
 DE2346787
 WO9806575
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.