blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2365160

EP2365160 - Compound tent structure with portico [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/37]Saddle shaped tent with portico
[2017/29]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2022
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2022  [2022/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Warner, Gerhard Allan
15427 -99th Avenue
Surrey BC V3S 2A1 / CA
[2011/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/37]Fiener, Josef, et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Application number, filing date11001129.311.02.2011
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateUS20100303889P12.02.2010         Original published format: US 303889 P
US20111302329608.02.2011         Original published format: US201113023296
[2013/13]
Former [2011/37]US20100303889P12.02.2010
US2011002329608.02.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2365160
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2365160
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2015
ClassificationIPC:E04H15/18, E04H3/10, E04H15/38, E04B1/342
[2015/20]
CPC:
E04H15/18 (EP,US); E04B1/342 (EP,US); E04H15/38 (EP,US);
E04H3/10 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2011/37]E04H15/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/52]
Former [2011/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zusammengesetzes Zelt mit Portikus[2017/30]
English:Compound tent structure with portico[2017/29]
French:Tente composite avec portique[2017/29]
Former [2011/37]Sattelförmiges Zelt mit Portikus
Former [2011/37]Saddle shaped tent with portico
Former [2011/37]Tente ayant une forme de selle avec portique
Examination procedure13.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2015Examination requested  [2015/52]
20.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.05.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/10]
20.10.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2022/10]
Appeal following examination20.06.2018Appeal received No.  T2382/18
20.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
29.09.2020Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2020/40]
30.11.2020Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2020/49]
21.04.2021Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
28.04.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
01.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
28.02.2021Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.03.201808   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2018
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Stay/Interruption10.02.2020Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died[2020/22]
01.09.2020Resumption of proceedings[2020/22]
Documents cited:Search[X]US6345638  (WARNER GERY [CA]) [X] 1,2,9 * figures 1-4 *;
 [I]DE9108528U  (ZENON FRANZ HIRSCH) [I] 1-10 * page 2, line 44 - line 47; figures 11,12 *;
 [A]FR2410099  (GERPIAM [FR]) [A] 11-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1071711  (HUDDLE CARL F) [A] 1,10,11 * figure 19 *;
 [A]US3534750  (KOLOZSVARY ARPAD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.