Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2343070

EP2343070 - Pirfenidone treatment for patients with atypical liver function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intermune, Inc.
3280 Bayshore Boulevard
Brisbane, CA 94005-1021 / US
[2011/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Bradford, Williamson Ziegler
PO Box 1864
Wilson, WY 83014 / US
02 / Szwarcberg, Javier
2173 Bunker Hill Drive
San Mateo, California 94402 / US
[N/P]
Former [2011/28]01 / Bradford, Williamson Ziegler
PO Box 566
Ross, California 94957 / US
02 / Szwarcberg, Javier
2173 Bunker Hill Drive
San Mateo, California 94402 / US
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2011/28]Pilkington, Stephanie Joan
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date11001414.906.11.2009
[2011/28]
Priority number, dateUS20080113107P10.11.2008         Original published format: US 113107 P
US20090228943P27.07.2009         Original published format: US 228943 P
US2009055329203.09.2009         Original published format: US 553292
US2009042839322.04.2009         Original published format: US 428393
[2011/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2343070
Date:13.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2343070
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4412, A61P11/00
[2011/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/28]
Extension statesAL03.03.2011
BA03.03.2011
RS03.03.2011
TitleGerman:Pirfenidone Behandlung für Patienten mit atypischer Leberfunktion[2011/28]
English:Pirfenidone treatment for patients with atypical liver function[2011/28]
French:Traitement avec le pirfenidone de patients avec fonctions hépatique atypique[2013/45]
Former [2011/28]Traitement avec le pirfenidone de patients avec fonctions hépatique atipique
Examination procedure03.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
13.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2013
09.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
02.06.2014Fee for grant paid
02.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09252572.4  / EP2191831
Divisional application(s)EP12166073.2  / EP2505199
EP12166074.0  / EP2500019
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090252572) is  28.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  15.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  15.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  15.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
21.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2470/16
07.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
02.06.2014Request for further processing filed
02.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.07.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMK07.11.2016
SM02.06.2017
CY06.11.2018
LU06.11.2018
LV06.11.2018
EE30.11.2018
MC30.11.2018
IS31.05.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]MK07.11.2016
SM02.06.2017
CY06.11.2018
LU06.11.2018
EE30.11.2018
MC30.11.2018
Former [2019/35]MK07.11.2016
SM02.06.2017
CY06.11.2018
LU06.11.2018
MC30.11.2018
Former [2019/34]MK07.11.2016
SM02.06.2017
LU06.11.2018
MC30.11.2018
Former [2019/33]MK07.11.2016
SM02.06.2017
MC30.11.2018
Former [2018/40]MK07.11.2016
SM02.06.2017
Former [2017/45]SM02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007117841  (OZES OSMAN N [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9,12 * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0358] * * paragraph [0297] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0131] *;
 [X]WO2005040758  (INTERMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,9,11 * page 81, paragraph 360 * * claims 1,5 * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0141] *;
 [X]WO2008077068  (INTERMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] *;
 [XP]US7566729  (BRADFORD WILLIAMSON ZIEGLER [US], et al) [XP] 1,3,5,8,9,11 * column 11, paragraph 3 * * claim 1 *
Examination   - HINCHCLIFF ET AL., "Systemic sclerosis...", AM. FAM. PHYSIC., (2008), vol. 78, no. 8, pages 961 - 968
by applicantUS3974281
 US4042699
 US4052509
 US5310562
 US5518729
 US5716632
 WO2007038315
 US2006037057
    - RAGHU ET AL., "Treatment of idiopathic pulmonary fibrosis with a new antifibrotic agent, pirfenidone: results of a prospective, open-label phase II study", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1999), vol. 159, pages 1061 - 1069
    - NAGAI ET AL., "Open label compassionate use one year-treatment with pirfenidone to patients with chronic pulmonary fibrosis", INTERNAL MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 41, pages 1118 - 1123
    - MOISES ET AL., "A double-blind, multicenter study comparing pirfenidone and prednisone for moderate-to-severe pulmonary fibrosis", CHEST, (2003), vol. 124, page 116
    - AZUMA ET AL., "Double-blind, placebo-controlled trial of pirfenidone in patients with idiopathic pulmonary fibrosis", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2005), vol. 171, pages 1040 - 1047
    - Cecil Textbook of Medicine, W.B. SAUNDERS & CO., (1985), pages 2317 - 2341