Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2333028

EP2333028 - Photochromic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2018  [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRANSITIONS OPTICAL, INC.
9251 Belcher Road
Pinellas Park, FL 33782 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2011/24]For all designated states
TRANSITIONS OPTICAL, INC.
9251 Belcher Road
Pinellas Park, FL 33782 / US
Inventor(s)01 / He, Meng
3153 Barberry Court
Murrysville PA 15668 / US
02 / Kellar, Terry A. II
2130 Valerga Drive 3
Belmont, California 94002 San Mateo County / US
03 / Kumar, Anil
2402 Oakhurst Court
Murrysville Pennsylvania 15668 / US
04 / Blakburn, Forrest R.
4441 Marywood Drive
Monroeville PA 15146 / US
 [2011/31]
Former [2011/24]01 / He, Meng
3153 Barberry Court
Murrysville PA 15668 / US
02 / Kellar, Terry A. II
200 Elliot Road
Monroeville PA 15146 / US
03 / Kumar, Anil
2402 Oakhurst Court
Murrysville Pennsylvania 15668 / US
04 / Blakburn, Forrest R.
4441 Marywood Drive
Monroeville PA 15146 / US
Representative(s)f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2017/45]
Former [2014/03]polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2011/24]Polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date11001431.326.05.2004
[2011/24]
Priority number, dateUS20030484100P01.07.2003         Original published format: US 484100 P
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2333028
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2333028
Date:08.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C09K9/02, G02B5/23, G02C7/10, G03C1/73, C07D311/92, C07D498/10, C07D493/04, C07D495/04, C07D409/06
[2011/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2017/45]
Former [2011/24]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Photochrome Verbindungen[2017/44]
English:Photochromic compounds[2011/24]
French:Composes photochromiques[2011/24]
Former [2011/24]Photochromische Verbindungen
Examination procedure17.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/52]
27.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2017Fee for grant paid
25.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04753341.9  / EP1639058
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040753341) is  05.03.2009
Opposition(s)09.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
Licence(s)ID:01 01/exclusive
For:[DE, ES, FR, GB, IT]
Licencee:Transitions Optical Limited
IDA Industrial Estate
Dunmore Road
Tuam
Galway / IE
Date:13.05.2016
[2016/27]
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0119813  (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [I] 1 * page 6, line 17 through page 18, line 2, Examples, claims *;
 [I]US2003008958  (MOMODA JUNJI [JP], et al) [I] 1 * page 8, paragraphs [0094] to [0099], page 9, compound XVIII, paragraph [0109], compounds XXI, XXII, XXV, XXVI-XXVIII, Examples *;
 [I]WO0170719  (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [I] 1 * page 3, line 24 through page 24, line 4, Examples, claims *;
 [A]WO0015630  (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 3 through page 11, line 12, Examples, claims *;
 [A]EP0619358  (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 23 through page 7, line 38, claims *;
 [A]EP0965628  (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 30 through page 13, line 18, Examples, claims *;
 [A]WO8905464  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 15 through page 16, line 26, page 17, Table I, page 18, formula (IV), page 19, Table II, page 21, formula (VII), page 23 and 24, Table III, pages 26-33, pages 36 and 37 *;
 [A]WO9201959  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 13 through page 21, line 22, claims *;
 [A]WO9317071  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 21 through page 20, line 9, claims *
by applicantUS5645767
 US5723072
 US5698141
 US6153126
 US6022497
 US5658501
 US4931220
 US6113814
 US6555028
 US6080338
 US6136968
 US6296785
 US6348604
 US6353102
 US6630597
 US5962617
 US3361706
 US6641874
    - "IUPAC Compendium of Chemical Technoloqv", International Union of Pure and Applied Chemistry, (1997),
    - "Photochromism", Techniques in Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (1971),
    - GEORGE A. OLAH, Friedel-Crafts and Related Reactions, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 3,
    - ISHIHARA, YUGI ET AL., "Regioselective Friedel-Crafts Acylation of 1,2,3,4-Tetrahydroquinoline and Related Nitrogen Heterocycles: Effect on NH Protective Groups and Ring Size", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1992), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1039/p19920003401, pages 3401 - 3406, XP002968898

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19920003401