Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2367118

EP2367118 - Method and devices for generating two-dimensional visual objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GMC Software AG
Hirschengasse 12
9050 Appenzell / CH
[2011/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Letocha, Boris
Prazska 775
50004 Hradec Kralove / CZ
02 / Knoulich, Jan
U Strelnice 884
50009 Hradec Kralove / CZ
 [2011/38]
Representative(s)Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Rentsch Partner AG
Assoc. No. 254
Fraumünsterstrasse 9
Postfach 9 P.O. Box 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Former [2011/38]Rentsch Partner AG
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date11001927.009.03.2011
[2011/38]
Priority number, dateCH2010000035815.03.2010         Original published format: CH 3582010
[2011/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2367118
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/21
[2011/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnungen zur Erzeugung zweidimensionale visuale Objekte[2011/38]
English:Method and devices for generating two-dimensional visual objects[2011/38]
French:Procédé et dispositifs de création des object visuels à deux dimensions[2011/38]
Examination procedure05.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/16]
02.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.04.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination29.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1865/17
07.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
12.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
01.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007024626  (KAGLE JONATHAN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [Y]US6073148  (ROWE EDWARD R [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - line 67 * * column 9, line 45 - line 60; figure 13a * * column 27, line 58 - column 29, line 62 *
by applicantUS2007024626