Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2511580

EP2511580 - Feed-through for installation in a wall or floor element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hauff-Technik GmbH & Co. KG
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 9
89568 Hermaringen / DE
[2014/29]
Former [2012/42]For all designated states
Hauff-Technik GmbH & Co. KG
In den Stegwiesen 18
89542 Herbrechtingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kurz, Ralf
Forchenstrasse 14
89537 Giengen / DE
02 / Heck, Martin
Schulstrasse 13
89447 Zöschingen / DE
 [2012/42]
Representative(s)Szynka, Dirk , et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Machtlfinger Strasse 9
81379 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/52]Szynka, Dirk , et al
König, Szynka, Tilmann, von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Sollner Strasse 9
81479 München / DE
Former [2012/42]Tilmann, Max Wilhelm , et al
König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date11002284.521.03.2011
[2012/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2511580
Date:17.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2511580
Date:29.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:F16L5/10, E04G15/06
[2012/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/42]
TitleGerman:Durchführung zum Einbau in ein Wand- oder Bodenelement[2012/42]
English:Feed-through for installation in a wall or floor element[2012/42]
French:Passage destiné à l'intégration dans un élément de paroi ou de sol[2012/42]
Examination procedure11.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/42]
04.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2013Fee for grant paid
10.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.2014   
Roxtec AB
Box 540
371 23 Karlskrona / SE
Opponent's representative
Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje, et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2014   
Roxtec AB
Box 540
371 23 Karlskrona / SE
Opponent's representative
Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje, et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
08.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0750/16
13.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.03.2011
AL29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MK29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU21.03.2011
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MK29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2017/41]HU21.03.2011
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/33]HU21.03.2011
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/32]HU21.03.2011
CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/31]CY29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/27]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/22]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/12]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2016/07]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
GB21.03.2015
Former [2015/07]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
IE21.03.2014
Former [2014/11]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/02]FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
RS29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XAY]GB2171139  (HAUFF WERNER) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,11,12 * figure 1 * [A] 3,6-8 [Y] 10,13-15;
 [XAY]DE958671  (NILS BRATTBERG DIPL ING) [X] 1,3,4,11 * figure 4 * [A] 2,5,7-9,12 [Y] 10,13-15;
 [X]US6386550  (MOKRZYCKI JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * figure 3 *;
 [X]DE8700714U  (BETONBAU GMBH) [X] 1,4,6 * figure 2 *