blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2373101 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2373101



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 299
04.01.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 5
14.12.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
08.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 9
06.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.09.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.09.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
31.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.08.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.08.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.08.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
24.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
17.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
10.06.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
27.01.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
27.11.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
19.06.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
03.06.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
19.02.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
12.02.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
12.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.10.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.09.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.08.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.08.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
30.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.05.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.05.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.04.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.04.2014 Decision Search / examination 1
02.04.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
02.04.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 1
17.02.2014 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 26
27.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
01.08.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 4
15.05.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
10.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
06.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
06.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 Description Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
08.05.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.03.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (reply to communication from Examining Division too late) Search / examination 2
06.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
06.02.2012 Description Search / examination 3
06.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.12.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2011 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
07.09.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
27.07.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.07.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.07.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
09.06.2011 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
06.06.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
04.04.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
04.04.2011 Description Search / examination 8
04.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 Drawings Search / examination 4
04.04.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8