blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2373101


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.06.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
31.05.2016 New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal
22.03.2016 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
30.01.2016 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
30.01.2016 New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal
26.06.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
04.06.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.02.2015 Change - applicant published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
15.10.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.09.2014 Deletion: Appeal number
08.09.2014 New entry: Appeal number
04.07.2014 Change: Appeal number
04.07.2014 New entry: Appeal number
07.05.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2014 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
06.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2013 Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.04.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.04.2013 Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing
10.04.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
10.04.2013 Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.04.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
22.02.2013 Change - priority published on  27.03.2013  [2013/13]
09.11.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.11.2012 Deletion: Decision on request for further processing
23.05.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
23.05.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
02.03.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.03.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.03.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.10.2011  [2011/40]
02.09.2011 Request for examination filed published on  05.10.2011  [2011/40]
02.09.2011 First examination report