blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2373101 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201110083485 EP11002792



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2011244823Global Dossier 06.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201113076442 31.03.2011
US32032910 02.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102215460Global Dossier 12.10.2011A
Priority number Date
US201113076442 31.03.2011
US32032910 02.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2373101Global Dossier 05.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201113076442 31.03.2011
US32032910 02.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201204127 16.01.2012A
Priority number Date
US201113076442 31.03.2011
US32032910 02.04.2010