Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2373101

EP2373101 - Method to inform user equipment to perform register procedure in wireless communications system and related communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2015
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2016New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City 330 / TW
[2015/13]
Former [2011/40]For all designated states
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Te-Ming
c/o HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Rd.
Taoyuan City Toayuan County 330 / TW
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date11002792.704.04.2011
[2011/40]
Priority number, dateUS20100320329P02.04.2010         Original published format: US 320329 P
US20111307644231.03.2011         Original published format: US201113076442
[2013/13]
Former [2011/40]US20100320329P02.04.2010
US2011007644231.03.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2373101
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04W60/00
[2011/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Information einer Benutzervorrichtung zur Durchführung der Registrierung eines Verfahrens in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem und zugehörige Kommunikationsvorrichtung[2011/40]
English:Method to inform user equipment to perform register procedure in wireless communications system and related communication device[2011/40]
French:Procédé d'information d'équipement d'utilisateur pour effectuer une procédure d'enregistrement dans un système de communication sans fil et dispositif de communication associé[2011/40]
Examination procedure04.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/40]
27.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/31]
15.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/31]
Appeal following examination30.05.2014Appeal received No.  T1825/14
04.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
27.11.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2015/48]
27.01.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/05]
05.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.09.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.03.2012Request for further processing filed
08.03.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.02.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003050097  (AMIRIJOO SHAHROKH [SE] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,14,15,18 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] - [ 0030] , [ 0031] , [ 0068] - [0078] - [ 0083] * [I] 4,6-13,16,17,19-23;
 [A]WO2007148932  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]; KIM JUNG-IM [KR]; KIM JAE-HEUNG [KR];) [A] 1-23 * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 28 *;
 [A]WO9849846  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-23 * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 7 *