EP2354028 - Liquid spouting nozzle with a packaging bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/32] | Liquid spouting nozzle and a packaging bag using the nozzle | ||
[2013/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yushin Co., Ltd. 964, Yanagawa-Shinden Sanjo-shi Niigata 955-0002 / JP | [2013/25] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Yushin Co., Ltd. 2-13-15 Higashiuradate Sanjo-shi Niigata 955-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Yoshikazu 2-7-19-906, Tsurugamine Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0022 / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
Kasai, Yoshikazu 2-7-19-906, Tsurugamine Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0022 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003170.5 | 19.10.2004 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040224041 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004224041 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2354028 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2354028 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
B65D75/5866 (EP,US);
B65D33/00 (KR);
B67D3/0051 (US);
B65D5/60 (KR);
B65D77/06 (KR);
B65D77/064 (EP,US);
Y10S383/906 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | B65D33/38, B65D5/60, B65D77/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsausgussdüse mit einem Verpackungsbeutel mit der Düse | [2013/09] | English: | Liquid spouting nozzle with a packaging bag | [2013/09] | French: | Buse à jaillissement liquide avec un sac d'emballage utilisant la buse | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/32] | Flüssigkeitsausgussdüse und ein Verpackungsbeutel mit der Düse | ||
Former [2011/32] | Liquid spouting nozzle and a packaging bag using the nozzle | ||
Former [2011/32] | Buse à jaillissement liquide et un sac d'emballage utilisant la buse | Examination procedure | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04792902.1 / EP1783061 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040792902) is 08.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2004 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | IE | 19.10.2013 | LU | 19.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 30.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2004175439 (YUSHIN GIKEN KK) [X] 1-3,8-11 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2,3,5; claim 4 * [I] 4-7; | [A]GB756346 (BRITISH CELLOPHANE LTD) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 51 - line 66 *; | [A]US2002141664 (MATSUDA NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0093] * |