Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2405067

EP2405067 - Sealing and assembly strip with cut protection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2019New entry: Despatch of observations of proprietor to parties involved + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanipat GmbH
Hauptstrasse 54
6045 Meggen / CH
[2018/33]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
GABAG Produktions & Vertriebs AG
Alte Zugerstrasse 12
6403 Küssnacht SZ / CH
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
Gassmann, Urs
Schlumpfenhof 3
6343 Holzhäusern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Gassmann, Urs
Küntwilerstrasse 60
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
 [2017/25]
Former [2012/02]01 / Gassmann, Urs
Meierskappelstraße 1
6044 Udligenswil / CH
Representative(s)Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]Reb, Carina
Patent- & Markenbüro Reb GmbH
Rigiblickstrasse 78
6353 Weggis / CH
Former [2012/02]Reb, Carina
Patentbüro Reb/RAin Untereggistrasse 4
6353 Weggis / CH
Application number, filing date11004035.916.05.2011
[2012/02]
Priority number, dateAT20100000438U09.07.2010         Original published format: AT 43810 U
[2013/10]
Former [2012/02]AT20100000438U09.07.2010
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2405067
Date:11.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2405067
Date:21.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/68, E04F13/08, C09K3/10, A47K3/00
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
Former [2012/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dicht- und Montageband mit einem Schnittschutz[2012/02]
English:Sealing and assembly strip with cut protection[2012/02]
French:Bande d'étanchéité et de montage dotée d'une protection contre les coupures[2012/02]
Examination procedure18.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
01.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
11.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2015Observations by third parties
27.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2017Observations by third parties
04.05.2017Fee for grant paid
04.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17000724.9  / EP3263790
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.03.2018  23.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Rivaplan AG c/o Hans Schacher
Schachenweidstrasse 8
6030 Ebikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
 02  21.03.2018  26.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Kaldewei GmbH & Co. KG
Beckumer Strasse 33-35
59229 Ahlen / DE
Opponent's representative
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 03  21.03.2018  26.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Zolyomi, Alexander
Am Bergacker 3
86932 Pürgen-Stoffen / DE
 04  16.08.2019  21.08.2019  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Hafner AG
Gewerbehaus Rotzlochstrasse
6371 Stans / CH
Opponent's representative
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
 [2019/39]
Former [2018/18]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2018  23.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Rivaplan AG c/o Hans Schacher
Schachenweidstrasse 8
6030 Ebikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
 02  21.03.2018  26.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Kaldewei GmbH & Co. KG
Beckumer Strasse 33-35
59229 Ahlen / DE
Opponent's representative
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 03  21.03.2018  26.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Zolyomi, Alexander
Am Bergacker 3
86932 Pürgen-Stoffen / DE
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2018   
Rivaplan AG c/o Hans Schacher
Schachenweidstrasse 8
6030 Ebikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
 02  21.03.2018   
Franz Kaldewei GmbH & Co. KG
Beckumer Strasse 33-35
59229 Ahlen / DE
Opponent's representative
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
04.04.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.08.2019Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
28.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
CY, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
11.10.2012Request for further processing filed
11.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.10.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
11.10.2012Request for further processing filed
11.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.10.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
11.10.2012Request for further processing filed
11.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.10.2012Decision despatched
19.09.2011Request for further processing filed
19.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.11.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
04.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/43]CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/50]LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/49]LT21.06.2017
GR22.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]DE102007043593  (BERND URBAN UND ANNA URBAN GBR [DE]) [X] 1-10,14,17-21 * the whole document * [A] 11,22 [I] 12,13,16;
 [XPA]US2010307093  (ZIELONKA KRZYSZTOF [CA]) [XP] 1,2,10,14,15,17,18 * figures 1c,1b * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0043] , [0045] , [0046] * [A] 11,12;
 [X]DE10105096  (KOESTER BAUCHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,10,14,15,17,18 * figure 1 * * columns 24,27,28 *
ExaminationWO2010086428
otherEP2391253
 WO2010086428
OppositionEP2071091
 EP1944155
 DE102007030868
 DE102007010997
 EP1891877
 WO2009086570
 DE29908603U
 DE102007043593
 US2010307093
 DE10105096
 CH701724
 CH690162
 DE8711126U
 WO2010086428
 US4828908
 US2006254207
 JPH09125560
 US7014803
 DE29905152U
 US7211291
 DE102006003076