Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2390222 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2390222



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 712
28.06.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
27.06.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
27.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.06.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.06.2019 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
17.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.06.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
12.06.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.06.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.05.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.05.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.05.2019 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
02.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
17.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.02.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.01.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.01.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.01.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.01.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
23.01.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 34
25.10.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
23.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
20.02.2018 Claims Appeal 6
20.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 13
16.10.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.10.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.10.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 30
12.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.07.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.07.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
02.06.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 21
02.06.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
18.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.05.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
12.05.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 21
12.05.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
08.05.2017 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
25.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
20.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
09.03.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
01.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.03.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Opposition 1
01.03.2017 General enquiry Opposition 2
23.02.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
01.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Opposition 1
01.02.2017 General enquiry Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 4
22.06.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
22.06.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.06.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.06.2016 General enquiry Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
12.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
06.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.11.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
06.07.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.07.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
18.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.11.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
09.07.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.06.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
04.06.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
04.06.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.06.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.06.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.06.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.06.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.06.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
04.06.2014 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 24
04.09.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.08.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.07.2013 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
22.07.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
22.07.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.06.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.06.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
25.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.05.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
29.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
29.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
29.05.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
05.12.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.11.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.09.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.09.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 4
30.09.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
26.09.2011 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
26.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.08.2011 Priority search results Search / examination 8
18.06.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.06.2011 Priority document Search / examination 29
17.06.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.06.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
19.05.2011 Description Search / examination 19
19.05.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 Drawings Search / examination 4
19.05.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8