Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2527546

EP2527546 - Shower device for WCs or bidets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.08.2015
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.09.2015  [2015/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geberit International AG
Schachenstrasse 77
8645 Jona / CH
[2012/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Bachmann, Simon
Güetlistrasse 24
8620 Wetzikon / CH
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)Szynka, Dirk , et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Machtlfinger Strasse 9
81379 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Szynka, Dirk , et al
König, Szynka, Tilmann, von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Sollner Strasse 9
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date11004229.823.05.2011
[2012/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2527546
Date:28.11.2012
Language:DE
[2012/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:E03D9/08, B01D35/16, B01D29/35
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Duscheinrichtung für WCs oder Bidets[2012/48]
English:Shower device for WCs or bidets[2012/48]
French:Dispositif de douche pour WC ou bidet[2012/48]
Examination procedure08.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/16]
26.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/37]
04.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2005120471  (LIM HOWARD T S [US]) [X] 1,14,15 * Bezugszeichen 43,;; figure 5 * [Y] 2,3,13;
 [Y]EP1338320  (DOUCET MS FILTRATION SUCCURSAL [CH]) [Y] 2,3,13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5087355  (GODEC C T [US]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6155430  (GOODMAN GEOFFREY [IL]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2125532  (CLEMENT WELLS HERBERT JAMES) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0154726  (JUDO WASSERAUFBEREITUNG [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0530965  (HONG CHONG HOON [KR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 33 * * column 4, line 3 - line 8 *