Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2402506

EP2402506 - Roller device for a switch tongue [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHWIHAG AG
Lebernstrasse 3
8274 Tägerwilen / CH
[2012/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Rützel, Tilmann
Brüelstr. 25
78462 Konstanz / DE
02 / Meyer, Frank
Karl-Bury-Weg 11 B
78333 Stockach / DE
03 / Wientges, Bernd
Friedrichstr. 27
78464 Konstanz / DE
 [2012/01]
Representative(s)Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger , et al
Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross
Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten
Hammerstrasse 3
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Valentin, Ekkehard
Patentanwälte
Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse-
Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske
Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Former [2012/01]Valentin, Ekkehard
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date11004506.901.06.2011
[2012/01]
Priority number, dateDE2010102577001.07.2010         Original published format: DE102010025770
[2012/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2402506
Date:04.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2402506
Date:26.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2402506
Date:31.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:E01B7/02
[2012/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2012/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rollvorrichtung für eine Zungenschiene einer Weiche[2012/01]
English:Roller device for a switch tongue[2012/01]
French:Dispositif de roulement pour une lame d'un aiguillage[2012/01]
Examination procedure02.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
15.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2016Fee for grant paid
18.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2016
Opposition(s)01.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]EE31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2018/11]EE31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/37]EE31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/32]EE31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/13]LV31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/11]RS31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/09]NO30.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH11278271  (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0035] - [0055]; figure - * [I] 4;
 [X]EP1052330  (BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE29509542U
 EP0654561