Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2535738

EP2535738 - Improved antenna beam forming for tracking a transmitter signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
[2018/07]
Former [2012/51]For all designated states
Astrium GmbH
Robert-Koch-Str. 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Floch, Jean-Jacques
Steinhauserstrasse 50
81667 München / DE
 [2012/51]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2012/51]Avenhaus, Beate
EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung
81663 München / DE
Application number, filing date11004867.515.06.2011
[2012/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2535738
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2535738
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/22, G01S19/23, H01Q3/26, H04B17/00
[2012/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/51]
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Antennenstrahlformung zur Verfolgung eines Sendersignals[2012/51]
English:Improved antenna beam forming for tracking a transmitter signal[2012/51]
French:Formation de faisceau d'antenne améliorée pour le suivi d'un signal de transmetteur[2012/51]
Examination procedure12.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/30]
13.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2019Fee for grant paid
07.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES07.08.2019
FI07.08.2019
HR07.08.2019
LT07.08.2019
LV07.08.2019
NL07.08.2019
RS07.08.2019
SE07.08.2019
BG07.11.2019
NO07.11.2019
GR08.11.2019
IS07.12.2019
PT09.12.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]ES07.08.2019
FI07.08.2019
HR07.08.2019
LT07.08.2019
LV07.08.2019
NL07.08.2019
RS07.08.2019
SE07.08.2019
BG07.11.2019
NO07.11.2019
GR08.11.2019
PT09.12.2019
Former [2020/10]FI07.08.2019
LT07.08.2019
NL07.08.2019
SE07.08.2019
BG07.11.2019
NO07.11.2019
PT09.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI07.08.2019
LT07.08.2019
NL07.08.2019
NO07.11.2019
Former [2020/08]LT07.08.2019
NO07.11.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]GB2418537  (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1 - page 7 *;
 [A]US6727846  (BROWN ALISON K [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1 - page 7 *;
 [A]US2010285752  (LAKSHMANAN SRIRAM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP2293103  (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *