Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2422773

EP2422773 - Sequestering subunit and related compositions and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2014Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.09.2014  [2014/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpharma Pharmaceuticals LLC
400 Crossing Boulevard
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
[2012/33]
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
Alpharma, Inc.
One Executive Drive
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Boehm, Garth
530 Mountain Ave
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2012/33]
Former [2012/09]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date11005555.522.09.2003
[2012/09]
Priority number, dateUS20020412208P20.09.2002         Original published format: US 412208 P
[2012/09]
Previously filed application, dateWO2003US2947522.09.2003
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2422773
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2422773
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K9/50
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:Sequestriermitteluntereinheit und zugehörige Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren[2012/09]
English:Sequestering subunit and related compositions and methods[2012/09]
French:Séquestration de sous-unité et compositions et procédés associés[2012/09]
Examination procedure18.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
12.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.04.2014
01.04.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/36]
24.04.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/36]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03752490.7  / EP1551372
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030752490) is  06.07.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
06.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0158447  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples 1,2 *;
 [XDP]WO03013538  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [XDP] 1-10 * page 25 - page 26; example 1 *
by applicantWO0158451
 US2003124185
 US2003044458
 US4293539
 US5266331
 US5549912
 US5508042
 US5656295
 US5290816
 US4812446
 US4424205
 US3845770
 US3916889
 US4063064
 US4088864
 US5321012
 US5556838
 US5502058
 US5616601
 US5604260
 US5593994
 US5550142
 US5536752
 US5521213
 US5475995
 US5639780
 US5604253
 US5552422
 US5510368
 US5436265
 US5409944
 US5130311
 US5514680
 US5087616
 US4957681
    - WEINHOLD ET AL., DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCE, (1992), vol. 30, pages 263 - 274
    - MENDELSON ET AL., CLIN. PHARM. THER., (1996), vol. 60, pages 105 - 114
    - WEINBERG ET AL., CLIN. PHARMACOL. THER., (1988), vol. 44, pages 335 - 340
    - GONZALEZ ET AL., DRUGS, (1988), vol. 35, pages 192 - 213
    - MEDICAL ECONOMICS, (1997), vol. 51, pages 957 - 959
    - TON ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1955), vol. 10, pages 175 - 182
    - ALFONSO R. GENARO, Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, 20th edition,, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS
    - UNKNOWN, NF21, the 2151 edition of the National Formulary,, UNITED STATES PHARMACOPEIAL CONVENTION INC.
    - Pharmaceutics and Pharmacy Practice, J.B. LIPPINCOTT COMPANY, (1982), pages 238 - 250
    - WADWA, J. DRUG TARGETING, (1995), vol. 3, page 111
    - AURTHER OSOL.,, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (1980), pages 1553 - 1593